EP1853591 - METHOD FOR OBTAINING A PHARMACEUTICALLY ACTIVE COMPOUND (IRBESARTAN) AND ITS SYNTHESIS INTERMEDIATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2010 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INKE, S.A. Pol. Ind. Can Pelegri- C. Argent, 1 08755 Castellbisbal / ES | [2007/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUGUET CLOTET, Joan Riera D'en Nofre 11 6A 08970 Sant Joan Despi / ES | 02 /
DALMASES BARJOAN, Pere Pi I Maragall 7 E-08980 Sant Feliu De Llobregat / ES | [2008/02] |
Former [2007/46] | 01 /
HUGUET CLOTET, Joan Riera D'en Nofre, 11-13 E-08970 Sant Joan Despi / ES | ||
02 /
DALMASES BARJOAN, Pere Pi I Maragall 7 E-08980 Sant Feliu De Llobregat / ES | Representative(s) | Ponti Sales, Adelaida Oficina Ponti C. Consell de Cent, 322 08007 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Ponti Sales, Adelaida Oficina Ponti C. Consell de Cent 322 08007 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [2007/46] | Ponti Sales, Adelaida C. de Consell de Cent 322 08007 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 06708469.9 | 23.02.2006 | [2007/46] | WO2006EP60208 | Priority number, date | ES20050000485 | 28.02.2005 Original published format: ES 200500485 | US20050685912P | 31.05.2005 Original published format: US 685912 P | ES20050003166 | 23.12.2005 Original published format: ES 200503166 | [2007/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006089927 | Date: | 31.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1853591 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1853591 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/10, C07F5/02, C07D235/02 | [2007/46] | CPC: |
C07D235/02 (EP,ES,US);
C07D403/10 (EP,ES,KR,US);
C07F5/02 (ES)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/46] | Extension states | AL | 12.09.2007 | BA | 12.09.2007 | HR | 12.09.2007 | MK | 12.09.2007 | YU | 12.09.2007 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR GEWINNUNG EINER PHARMAZEUTISCH WIRKSAMEN VERBINDUNG (IRBESATAN) UND ZWISCHENPRODUKT FÜR IHRE SYNTHESE | [2007/46] | English: | METHOD FOR OBTAINING A PHARMACEUTICALLY ACTIVE COMPOUND (IRBESARTAN) AND ITS SYNTHESIS INTERMEDIATE | [2007/46] | French: | PROCEDE POUR L'OBTENTION D'UN COMPOSE PHARMACEUTIQUEMENT ACTIF (IRBESARTAN) ET SON INTERMEDIAIRE DE SYNTHESE | [2007/46] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/46] | 17.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.11.2009 | BE | 25.11.2009 | CY | 25.11.2009 | CZ | 25.11.2009 | DK | 25.11.2009 | EE | 25.11.2009 | FI | 25.11.2009 | IT | 25.11.2009 | LT | 25.11.2009 | LV | 25.11.2009 | NL | 25.11.2009 | PL | 25.11.2009 | RO | 25.11.2009 | SE | 25.11.2009 | SI | 25.11.2009 | SK | 25.11.2009 | TR | 25.11.2009 | IE | 23.02.2010 | LU | 23.02.2010 | BG | 25.02.2010 | GB | 25.02.2010 | GR | 26.02.2010 | CH | 28.02.2010 | LI | 28.02.2010 | FR | 01.03.2010 | MC | 01.03.2010 | ES | 08.03.2010 | IS | 25.03.2010 | PT | 25.03.2010 | HU | 26.05.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LV | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
IE | 23.02.2010 | ||
LU | 23.02.2010 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GB | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
FR | 01.03.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
HU | 26.05.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LV | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
IE | 23.02.2010 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GB | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
FR | 01.03.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
HU | 26.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LV | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
IE | 23.02.2010 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GB | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
FR | 01.03.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LV | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
IE | 23.02.2010 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
FR | 01.03.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LV | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/41] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LV | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LV | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/31] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LV | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LV | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/26] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LV | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5629331 (CARON ANTOINE [FR], et al); | [Y]US2002045650 (MACKMAN RICHARD LAURENCE [US]); | [Y]WO2004039753 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al); | [YDX]WO2004065383 (TEVA PHARMA [IL], et al); | [X]WO2004072064 (TEVA PHARMA [IL], et al); | [PX]WO2005102987 (VITA CIENTIFICA S L [ES], et al); | Examination | DE4313747 |