EP1866844 - TRANSPONDER TICKET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2011 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schreiner Group GmbH & Co. KG Bruckmannring 22 85764 Oberschleissheim / DE | [2007/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHREINER, Helmut Schneeglöckchenstr. 69 80995 München / DE | [2007/51] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Postfach 20 07 34 80007 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/50] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Postfach 20 07 34 80007 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/51] | Ettmayr, Andreas, et al Kehl & Ettmayr Patentanwälte Friedrich-Herschel-Strasse 9 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06708571.2 | 01.03.2006 | [2007/51] | WO2006EP60347 | Priority number, date | DE20051016261 | 08.04.2005 Original published format: DE102005016261 | [2007/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006106020 | Date: | 12.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1866844 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/07 | [2007/51] | CPC: |
G06K19/07318 (EP);
G06K19/07726 (EP);
G06K19/07749 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRANSPONDERETIKETT | [2007/51] | English: | TRANSPONDER TICKET | [2007/51] | French: | ETIQUETTE A TRANSPONDEUR | [2007/51] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 14.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/31] | 16.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.04.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US6371378 (BRUNET OLIVIER ET AL) [X] 1-3,8,9,14-16,18-21 * abstract * * column 1, line 58 - column 3, line 9 * * column 3, line 48 - line 50 * * column 4, line 34 - line 67 * * figure 3 * [I] 4-7,10-13,17; | [A]FR2784083 (GEMPLUS) [A] 1-7,20,21 * abstract * * page 4, line 12 - page 7, line 25 * * figure - *; | [DA]WO9119649 (ALCAN INTERNATIONAL LIMITED) [DA] 11,12 * abstract *; | [A]EP0985547 (WITTE PLUSPRINT DRUCKMEDIEN GMBH) [A] 9 * abstract * |