EP1874529 - SHAPING DEVICE FOR PRODUCING GOODS FROM A MATERIAL STRAND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORNSCHUCH, Stephan An Der Siep 52 41238 Moenchengladbach / DE | 02 /
FUCHS, Joachim Richrather Str. 179 40723 Hilden / DE | [2008/02] | Application number, filing date | 06708792.4 | 17.03.2006 | [2008/02] | WO2006EP60818 | Priority number, date | DE20051018077 | 19.04.2005 Original published format: DE102005018077 | [2008/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006111442 | Date: | 26.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1874529 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1874529 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B30B11/20, B30B11/08, A23G3/02, A23G3/20 | [2008/02] | CPC: |
A23G3/0252 (EP,US);
A23G3/0289 (EP,US);
A23G3/2061 (EP,US);
B30B11/08 (EP,US);
B30B11/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [2017/10] |
Former [2008/30] | DE, ES, GB, IT | ||
Former [2008/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM FORMEN VON AUS EINEM MASSESTRANG GEFERTIGTEN WAREN | [2008/02] | English: | SHAPING DEVICE FOR PRODUCING GOODS FROM A MATERIAL STRAND | [2008/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR FORMER DES PRODUITS A PARTIR D'UN BOUDIN DE MATIERE | [2008/02] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/02] | 04.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 08.03.2017 | IT | 08.03.2017 | GB | 08.06.2017 | [2018/21] |
Former [2017/51] | ES | 08.03.2017 | |
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/44] | ES | 08.03.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US1920445 (HERMANN THURLINGS) [X] 1,5-8 * page 1, column L, line 1 - line 44; figure -; claim - * [Y] 2-4; | [X]US2002192330 (BUNKERS JOSEPH M [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0064]; figures 6-10,17-26 * * paragraph [0084] *; | [X]FR1442374 (CARLE & MONTANARI SPA) [X] 1,5,6 * page 3, column L, line 4 - line 14 *; | [X]US2865311 (HERMANN THURLINGS) [X] 1,5-8 * column 3, line 10 - line 55; figure 3 *; | [Y]FR1138867 (J.L.KOSTER ET AL.) [Y] 2-4 * page 1, column R; figure 1 *; | [X]FR1166245 (HANSELLA WERKE ALBERT HENKEL A) [X] 1,7,8 * page 2; figure 3 *; | [A]DE1627903 (ROEMER DIPL ING GERHARD) [A] 5 * figure 7 *; | [A]US4025270 (BECKERS HANS) [A] 1 * column 1, line 26 - line 45; figure - *; | [A]DE2920814 (CARLE & MONTANARI SPA) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE565952 (ERWIN ROEMER & CO G M B H) [A] 1,5-8 * figure - * | Examination | GB1398798 | DE1180234 |