EP1836699 - Method and device for carrying out optimized audio coding between two long-term prediction models [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/39] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT OPTIMAL CODING BETWEEN TWO LONG-TERM PREDICTION MODELS | ||
[2011/06] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/26] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/39] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GHENANIA, Mohamed 26, rue Pierre Dac 72100 Le Mans / FR | 02 /
LAMBLIN, Claude 13, rue Ernest Renan, Résidence Pont Couennec 22700 Perros Guirec / FR | [2007/39] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/39] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06709052.2 | 09.01.2006 | [2007/39] | WO2006FR00038 | Priority number, date | FR20050000272 | 11.01.2005 Original published format: FR 0500272 | [2007/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006075078 | Date: | 20.07.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1836699 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1836699 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/08 | [2007/39] | CPC: |
G10L19/173 (EP,US);
G10L19/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Ausführung einer optimalizierten Audiokodierung zwischen zwei Langzeitvorhersagemodellen | [2011/06] | English: | Method and device for carrying out optimized audio coding between two long-term prediction models | [2011/06] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de codage audio optimisé entre deux modèles de prediction à long terme | [2011/06] |
Former [2007/39] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUSFÜHRUNG EINER OPTIMALEN KODIERUNG ZWISCHEN ZWEI LANGZEITVORHERSAGEMODELLEN | ||
Former [2007/39] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT OPTIMAL CODING BETWEEN TWO LONG-TERM PREDICTION MODELS | ||
Former [2007/39] | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE CODAGE OPTIMISE ENTRE DEUX MODELES DE PREDICTION A LONG TERME | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/39] | 25.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.02.2011 | 17.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 11.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.01.2006 | AT | 29.06.2011 | CY | 29.06.2011 | CZ | 29.06.2011 | DK | 29.06.2011 | EE | 29.06.2011 | FI | 29.06.2011 | IE | 29.06.2011 | IT | 29.06.2011 | LT | 29.06.2011 | LV | 29.06.2011 | NL | 29.06.2011 | PL | 29.06.2011 | RO | 29.06.2011 | SE | 29.06.2011 | SI | 29.06.2011 | SK | 29.06.2011 | TR | 29.06.2011 | BG | 29.09.2011 | GR | 30.09.2011 | ES | 10.10.2011 | IS | 29.10.2011 | PT | 31.10.2011 | LU | 09.01.2012 | BE | 31.01.2012 | CH | 31.01.2012 | LI | 31.01.2012 | MC | 31.01.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
TR | 29.06.2011 | ||
BG | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
ES | 10.10.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
LU | 09.01.2012 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
TR | 29.06.2011 | ||
BG | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
ES | 10.10.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
BG | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
ES | 10.10.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
ES | 10.10.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | FI | 29.06.2011 | |
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | FI | 29.06.2011 | |
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 29.06.2011 | |
SE | 29.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO03058407 (DILITHIUM NETWORKS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-28* abstract *; | [PX]WO2005066936 (FRANCE TELECOM [FR], et al) [PX] 1,12,13,18-27,29 * the whole document *; | [X] - GHENANIA M ET AL, "TRANSCODAGE INTELLIGENT A FAIBLE COMPLEXITE EXTRE LES CODEURS UIT-T G.729 ET 3GPP NB-AMR (12.2 KBIT/S)", CORESA. COMPRESSION ET REPRESENTATION DES SIGNAUX AUDIOVISUELS, (20040525), pages 85 - 88, XP001199662 [X] 1,12,13,18-27,29 * the whole document * | [X] - JIN-KYU CHOI ET AL, "Improvement issues on transcoding algorithms: for the flexible usage to the various pairs of speech codec", 2004 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, MONTREAL, QUE., CANADA, (20040517), vol. 1, ISBN 0-7803-8484-9, pages 269 - 272, XP002345813 [X] 1,25-27,29 * abstract * |