EP1853472 - METHOD FOR FAST STARTING OF A HYBRID VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2012 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PEUGEOT CITROËN AUTOMOBILES S.A. Route de Gisy 78140 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR | [2011/17] |
Former [2007/46] | For all designated states PEUGEOT CITROËN AUTOMOBILES S.A. Route de Gisy 78140 Velizy Villacoublay / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIMAUX, Stéphane 30, rue Pierre Arnoux F-92190 Meudon / FR | 02 /
MIRANDA, Paulo 149, rue des Fauvelles, Appartement 1005 F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2007/46] | Application number, filing date | 06709532.3 | 24.02.2006 | [2007/46] | WO2006FR50162 | Priority number, date | FR20050050544 | 01.03.2005 Original published format: FR 0550544 | [2007/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006092522 | Date: | 08.09.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1853472 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1853472 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60W20/00, B60W10/06, B60W10/08 | [2007/46] | CPC: |
B60K6/48 (EP,US);
B60W20/30 (US);
B60L15/2072 (EP,US);
B60L50/16 (EP,US);
B60W10/02 (EP,US);
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W10/08 (EP,US);
B60W20/00 (EP);
B60W30/18027 (EP,US);
F02N11/006 (EP,US);
F02N15/08 (EP,US);
B60K2006/268 (EP);
B60L2240/421 (EP,US);
B60L2240/423 (EP,US);
B60L2240/441 (EP,US);
B60L2240/443 (EP,US);
B60L2240/486 (EP,US);
B60L2240/507 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
Y02T10/64 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (US);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,US);
Y02T10/72 (EP,US);
Y10S903/946 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SCHNELLSTARTEN EINES HYBRIDFAHRZEUGS | [2007/46] | English: | METHOD FOR FAST STARTING OF A HYBRID VEHICLE | [2007/46] | French: | PROCEDE DE DECOLLAGE RAPIDE D'UN VEHICULE HYBRIDE | [2007/46] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/46] | 12.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/14] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 02.07.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 02.07.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.07.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.02.2006 | AT | 27.04.2011 | CY | 27.04.2011 | CZ | 27.04.2011 | DK | 27.04.2011 | EE | 27.04.2011 | FI | 27.04.2011 | IE | 27.04.2011 | IT | 27.04.2011 | LT | 27.04.2011 | LV | 27.04.2011 | NL | 27.04.2011 | PL | 27.04.2011 | RO | 27.04.2011 | SE | 27.04.2011 | SI | 27.04.2011 | SK | 27.04.2011 | TR | 27.04.2011 | BG | 27.07.2011 | GR | 28.07.2011 | ES | 07.08.2011 | IS | 27.08.2011 | PT | 29.08.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
TR | 27.04.2011 | ||
BG | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
BG | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 27.04.2011 | |
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 27.04.2011 | |
PT | 29.08.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0965475 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0010] - [0020] ** figures 1-3 *; | [X]US6083139 (DEGUCHI YOSHITAKA [JP], et al) [X] 1-11 * column 3, lines 7-40 * * column 6, lines 10-25 * * column 7, lines 45-65 * * figures 6,7,11 *; | [A]US6253127 (ITOYAMA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,7-10 * column 1, lines 20-50 * * figures 5,6 *; | [X]EP1201479 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-7,11 * paragraphs [0020] - [0026] * * paragraphs [0042] - [0045] * * figures 1,7 *; | [X]US6543561 (PELS THOMAS [DE], et al) [X] 1-7,10,11 * column 2, lines 8-40 * * column 5, lines 5-25 * * figures 5,6 *; | [A]DE10204981 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0037] , [0038] * * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | FR2832357 |