EP1851988 - A METHOD OF CELL RE-SELECTION IN A MBMS- (MULTIMEDIA BROADCAST MULTICAST SERVICE) SYSTEM AFTER MBMS SESSION STOP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Siemens Networks GmbH & Co. KG St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | [2009/41] |
Former [2007/50] | For all designated states NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/46] | For all designated states NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS S.P.A. St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/45] | For all designated states NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PROCTOR, Toby, Kier 39 York Road Salisbury Wiltshire SP2 7AU / GB | [2007/45] | Representative(s) | Bruglachner, Thomas E., et al Nokia Siemens Networks GmbH & Co. KG COO RTP IPR / Patent Administration 80240 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Bruglachner, Thomas E., et al Nokia Siemens Networks GmbH & Co. KG COO RTP IPR / Patent Administration 80240 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/08] | Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2007/45] | Payne, Janice Julia, et al Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06709681.8 | 08.02.2006 | [2007/45] | WO2006GB00443 | Priority number, date | GB20050002496 | 08.02.2005 Original published format: GB 0502496 | [2007/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006085070 | Date: | 17.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1851988 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1851988 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/06, H04L12/56, H04L12/18 | [2009/12] | CPC: |
H04W36/0007 (EP,US);
H04W48/20 (EP,US);
H04W72/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/45] | H04Q7/38, H04L12/56, H04L12/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ZELLWIEDERAUSWAHL IN EINEM MBMS (MULTIMEDIA BROADCAST MULTICAST SERVICE) SYSTEM NACH EINEM MBMS-SITZUNGSENDE | [2007/45] | English: | A METHOD OF CELL RE-SELECTION IN A MBMS- (MULTIMEDIA BROADCAST MULTICAST SERVICE) SYSTEM AFTER MBMS SESSION STOP | [2007/45] | French: | METHODE DE RE-SELECTION DE CELLULE DANS UN SYSTEME MBMS (MULTIMEDIA BROADCAST MULTICAST SERVICE) APRES ARRET DE SESSION MBMS | [2007/45] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/45] | 20.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.10.2009 | BE | 07.10.2009 | CY | 07.10.2009 | CZ | 07.10.2009 | DK | 07.10.2009 | EE | 07.10.2009 | FI | 07.10.2009 | IT | 07.10.2009 | LT | 07.10.2009 | LV | 07.10.2009 | NL | 07.10.2009 | PL | 07.10.2009 | RO | 07.10.2009 | SE | 07.10.2009 | SI | 07.10.2009 | SK | 07.10.2009 | TR | 07.10.2009 | BG | 07.01.2010 | GR | 08.01.2010 | ES | 18.01.2010 | IS | 07.02.2010 | IE | 08.02.2010 | LU | 08.02.2010 | PT | 08.02.2010 | CH | 28.02.2010 | LI | 28.02.2010 | MC | 01.03.2010 | HU | 08.04.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
CY | 07.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
IT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
IE | 08.02.2010 | ||
LU | 08.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
HU | 08.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
CY | 07.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
IT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
IE | 08.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
HU | 08.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
CY | 07.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
IT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
IE | 08.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
IT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
IE | 08.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
IE | 08.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/41] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/29] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
BE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/26] | FI | 07.10.2009 | |
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | SI | 07.10.2009 | |
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/16] | SI | 07.10.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1467586 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0032] - [0036] * * claim 1 *; | [X] - NTT DOCOMO, "Frequency dispersion after MBMS reception", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG2 MEETING #43, Prague, Czech Republic, no. R2-041616, (20040816), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_43/Docs/, (20060413), XP002377181 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * | [A] - SAMSUNG, "Dispersion of UEs after session stop", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG2 MEETING #44, Sophia Antipolis, France, no. R2-041956, (20041004), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_44/Docs/, (20060413), XP002377182 [A] 1,2 * the whole document * | [A] - 3GPP, "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Radio Resource Control (RRC); Protocol Specification (Release 6); pages 257, 258, 349, 393, 394", 3GPP TS 25.331 V6.4.0, (200412), XP002377183 [A] 1,2 * pages 257/258, "8.5.27 Preferred frequency layer selection" page 349, "8.6.9.6 MBMS Required UE action" pages 393/394, "10.2.16j MBMS Modified Services Information" * | [PX] - NTT DOCOMO, NOKIA, QUALCOMM, SAMSUNG, "Change Request to 3GPP 25.331; Frquency Layer Dispersion", 3GPP TSG-RAN-WG2 MEETING #46BIS, Phoenix, USA, no. R2-051104, (20050214), pages 1 - 10, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_46bis/Documents/, (20060413), XP002377184 [PX] 1,2 * CR page 3, "8.5.27 Preferred frequency layer selection" CR page 4/5, "8.6.9.6 MBMS Required UE action" CR page 6/7, "10.2.16j MBMS Modified Services Information" * | [PX] - 3GPP, "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Radio Resource Control (RRC); Protocol Specification (Release 6); pages 262, 263, 353, 354, 402-404", 3GPP TS 25.331 V6.6.0, (200506), XP002377185 [PX] 1,2 * pages 262/263, "8.5.27 MBMS frequency" page 353/354, "8.6.9.6 MBMS Required UE action" pages 402-404, "10.2.16j MBMS Modified Services Information" * | [A] - "Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); Introduction of Multimedia Broadcast/Multicast Service (MBMS) in the Radio Access Network (RAN); Stage 2 (3GPP TS 25.346 version 6.3.0 Release 6); ETSI TS 125 346", ETSI STANDARDS, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE, SOPHIA-ANTIPO, FR, (200412), vol. 3-R2, no. V630, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014027674 [A] 1 * page 49/50, "11.2 Frequency layer Convergence" * | [DA] - "Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); User Equipment (UE) procedures in idle mode and procedures for cell reselection in connected mode (3GPP TS 25.304 version 6.4.0 Release 6); ETSI TS 125 304", ETSI STANDARDS, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE, SOPHIA-ANTIPO, FR, (200412), vol. 3-R2, no. V640, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014027643 [DA] 1,2 * the whole document * |