EP1842143 - EMBEDDED TRANSLATION-ENHANCED SEARCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.12.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.01.2010 [2010/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Melingo, Ltd. 16 Totseret Haaretz St. 67891 Tel Aviv-Yafo / IL | [2007/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEEMAN, Yoni M., Melingo LTD. 16 Totseret Haaretz Str. 67891 Tel Aviv-Yafo / IL | [2007/41] | Representative(s) | Giver, Sören Bo Awapatent AB Box 1066 251 10 Helsingborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/41] | Giver, Sören Bo Awapatent AB Box 1066 251 10 Helsingborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 06710226.9 | 10.01.2006 | [2007/41] | WO2006IB00030 | Priority number, date | US20050642115P | 10.01.2005 Original published format: US 642115 P | [2007/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006072882 | Date: | 13.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1842143 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2007/41] | CPC: |
G06F16/3326 (EP,US);
G06F16/951 (EP,US);
G06F16/9535 (EP,US);
G06F16/9538 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DURCH EINGEBETTETE ÜBERSETZUNG VERBESSERTE SUCHE | [2007/41] | English: | EMBEDDED TRANSLATION-ENHANCED SEARCH | [2007/41] | French: | RECHERCHE AMELIOREE A TRADUCTION INTEGREE | [2007/41] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/41] | 01.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/04] | 08.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2003146939 (PETROPOULOS JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-25 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0031]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0058] *; | [X] - "The global structure of an HTML document", INTERNET ARTICLE, HTML 4.01 SPECIFICATIONS, W3C RECOMMENDATION, (19991224), URL: http://www.w3.org/TR/html4/struct/global.html, (20060511), XP002380797 [X] 1-4,6-8,10-12,14,15,19-23 * paragraph 7.4.3 "The title attribute" * | [A] - DROR ET AL, "A Comprehensive NLP System for Modern Standard Arabic and Modern Hebrew", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ACL-02 WORKSHOP ON COMPUTATIONAL APPROACHES TO SEMITIC LANGUAGES, Association for Computational Linguistics, Morristown, NJ, USA, (2002), pages 1 - 9, URL: http://portal.acm.org/citation.cfm?id=1118637.1118646, (20060512), XP002380798 [A] 1,5,10,13,15,16,22 * abstract * * paragraph 2 "A Description of the Morfix Architecture and its Application" * | [A] - CHUNG C ET AL, "Using Handheld and Wireless Technology for Classroom and Community-Based South Asian Language Pedagogy", INTERNET CITATION, (20040128), XP002372102 [A] 1,10,15,22 * page 7, column L, paragraph L; figure 3 * |