EP1858401 - MEDICAL APPARATUS SYSTEM HAVING OPTICAL FIBER LOAD SENSING CAPABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2010 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Endosense S.A. Route de Satigny 42 1217 Meyrin / CH | [2007/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEO, Giovanni Avenue Des Cavaliers CH-1224 Chene Bougeries / CH | 02 /
AEBY, Nicolas 6, Rue Louis Curval CH-1206 Geneve / CH | 03 /
INAUDI, Daniele Via Cassarinetta 2 CH-6900 Lugano / CH | [2007/48] | Representative(s) | Bugnion Genève Bugnion S.A. Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Route de Florissant 10 Case Postale 375 1211 Genève 12 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2007/48] | Bugnion Genève Bugnion S.A. P.O.Box 375 1211 Geneva 12 / CH | Application number, filing date | 06710474.5 | 01.03.2006 | [2007/48] | WO2006IB00428 | Priority number, date | EP20050004852 | 04.03.2005 Original published format: EP 05004852 | [2007/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006092707 | Date: | 08.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1858401 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, G01L1/24 | [2007/48] | CPC: |
G01L1/246 (EP,US);
A61B5/065 (EP,US);
A61B90/06 (EP,US);
A61B90/96 (EP,US);
A61B90/98 (EP,US);
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHES GERÄTESYSTEM MIT FASEROPTISCHER LASTMESSUNG | [2007/48] | English: | MEDICAL APPARATUS SYSTEM HAVING OPTICAL FIBER LOAD SENSING CAPABILITY | [2007/48] | French: | APPAREIL MEDICAL AYANT UNE CAPACITE DE DETECTION DE CHARGE A FIBRE OPTIQUE | [2007/48] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/48] | 16.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/25] | 09.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]WO0133165 (ADVANCED SENSOR TECHNOLOGY LLC [US], et al) [Y] 21,23-27,34,37 * page 5, line 6 - page 8, line 7 * [A] 1,22; | [Y]US6266551 (OSADCHY DANIEL [IL], et al) [Y] 21,23-27,34,37 * column 1, line 66 - column 3, line 4 *; | [Y]US2002041723 (RONNEKLEIV ERLEND [NO], et al) [Y] 24-27 * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0059] *; | [A]US2004165810 (FUJITA HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 1,21 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0033] *; | [A] - RAO Y J, "Recent progress in applications of in-fibre Bragg grating sensors", OPTICS AND LASERS IN ENGINEERING ELSEVIER UK, (199904), vol. 31, no. 4, ISSN 0143-8166, pages 297 - 324, XP002337593 [A] 5-8,24-27 * 4. Applications to medicine p. 310-312 * * 4.1 Temperature p. 312-316 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0143-8166(99)00025-1 | [A] - INAUDI D, "Application of optical fiber sensor in civil structural monitoring", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING SPIE-INT. SOC. OPT. ENG USA, (2001), vol. 4328, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 1 - 10, XP002336684 [A] 5-8,24-27 * Fiber optic sensor types p. 1-7, tableau 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.435512 | Examination | WO2007015139 | EP1909650 | - US PATENT APPLICATION US 11/237,053, FILING DATE 28-09-2005 |