EP1851752 - SOUND SYNTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2016/37] |
Former [2013/39] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2007/45] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SZCZERBA, Marek C/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
DEN BRINKER, Albertus, C. C/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
GERRITS, Andreas, J. C/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
OOMEN, Arnoldus, W., J. C/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
KLEIN MIDDELINK, Marc C/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2007/45] | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik, et al Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2016/37] |
Former [2012/34] | Verweij, Petronella Danielle, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2007/45] | Groenendaal, Antonius W. M. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 06710801.9 | 01.02.2006 | [2007/45] | WO2006IB50338 | Priority number, date | EP20050100948 | 10.02.2005 Original published format: EP 05100948 | [2007/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006085244 | Date: | 17.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1851752 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1851752 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G10H1/22, G10H7/00 | [2016/13] | CPC: |
G10H7/00 (EP,KR,US);
G10H1/22 (EP,KR,US);
G10H2230/041 (EP,KR,US);
G10H2250/495 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/45] | G10H7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/37] |
Former [2007/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SCHALLSYNTHESE | [2016/13] | English: | SOUND SYNTHESIS | [2007/45] | French: | SYNTHESE SONORE | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/45] | TONSYNTHESE | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/45] | 04.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.02.2006 | AT | 14.09.2016 | BE | 14.09.2016 | CY | 14.09.2016 | CZ | 14.09.2016 | DK | 14.09.2016 | EE | 14.09.2016 | ES | 14.09.2016 | FI | 14.09.2016 | IT | 14.09.2016 | LT | 14.09.2016 | LV | 14.09.2016 | MC | 14.09.2016 | NL | 14.09.2016 | PL | 14.09.2016 | RO | 14.09.2016 | SE | 14.09.2016 | SI | 14.09.2016 | SK | 14.09.2016 | BG | 14.12.2016 | GR | 15.12.2016 | IS | 14.01.2017 | PT | 16.01.2017 | IE | 01.02.2017 | LU | 01.02.2017 | CH | 28.02.2017 | LI | 28.02.2017 | [2019/46] |
Former [2019/31] | HU | 01.02.2006 | |
AT | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
IE | 01.02.2017 | ||
LU | 01.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
IE | 01.02.2017 | ||
LU | 01.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
LU | 01.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | ES | 14.09.2016 | |
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/12] | ES | 14.09.2016 | |
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 14.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5029509 (SERRA XAVIER [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * abstract *; | [A]US5686683 (FREED ADRIAN [US]) [A] 1-22 * abstract *; | [A]US5744742 (LINDEMANN ERIC [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * abstract *; | [A]US5886276 (LEVINE SCOTT N [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * abstract *; | [A]US5977469 (SMITH DAVID L [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * column 9, line 64 - column 10, line 2 *; | [A]US2005004791 (VAN DE KERKHOF LEON MARIA [NL], et al) [A] 1-22* paragraphs [0038] - [0040]; figure 2 * |