EP1856685 - ACTIVE MATRIX DISPLAY DEVICES AND METHODS OF DRIVING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.12.2007 [2007/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/47] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DEN HOMBERG, John c/o Philips Intellectual Property & Standards Cross Oak Lane Redhill Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | 02 /
BERGVELD, Hendrik, J. c/o Philips Intellectual Property & Standards Cross Oak Lane Redhill Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | 03 /
SCHOOFS, Frans c/o Philips Intellectual Property & Standards Cross Oak Lane Redhill Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | [2007/47] | Representative(s) | Schouten, Marcus Maria NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/47] | Schouten, Marcus Maria Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 06710976.9 | 27.02.2006 | [2007/47] | WO2006IB50606 | Priority number, date | EP20050101617 | 02.03.2005 Original published format: EP 05101617 | [2007/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006092757 | Date: | 08.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1856685 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36 | [2007/47] | CPC: |
G09G3/3685 (EP,US);
G09G2300/08 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0248 (EP,US);
G09G2320/029 (EP,US);
G09G3/2014 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AKTIVE MATRIXANZEIGEEINRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER ANSTEUERUNG | [2007/47] | English: | ACTIVE MATRIX DISPLAY DEVICES AND METHODS OF DRIVING THE SAME | [2007/47] | French: | DISPOSITIFS D'AFFICHAGE A MATRICE ACTIVE ET PROCEDES D'ENTRAINEMENT DE CEUX-CI | [2007/47] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/47] | 29.10.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/51] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2002014628 (KOYAMA JUN [JP]) [X] 1-6,8-10,20-23 * paragraphs [0047] , [0104] , [0122] , [0124]; figures 7,9,11,13 * [Y] 11-17,24-29; | [Y]US2004070558 (COK RONALD S [US], et al) [Y] 11-17,24-29 * paragraph [0025]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2004252084 (MIYAGAWA KEISUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-29 * paragraphs [0013] , [0017] , [0047] , [0049] - [0058] - [0060] - [0065]; figures 6A,6B7 *; | [A]US2004263437 (HATTORI REIJI [JP]) [A] 1-29 * paragraphs [0143] , [0144]; figures 1,2 * |