EP1862018 - SMART CONTAINER MONITORING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.04.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 12.05.2010 [2010/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hi-G-Tek Inc. 5410 Edson Lane, Suite 320A North Bethesda, MD 20852 / US | [2007/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AUERBACH, Micha 52 Saifan Street 71908 Maccabim / IL | 02 /
COHEN, Rony 7 Hadolev Street 42823 Zoran / IL | 03 /
GOLAN, Eli 30 Kehilat Bavel Street 47322 Ramat Hasharon / IL | 04 /
ISENBERG, Alex 56/2 Zabotinsky Street 75277 Rishon Lezion / IL | 05 /
GENIN, Arcadi 12 Hachalmit Street 67420 Bat Yam / IL | 06 /
SENDER, Ran 23 Dobnov Street 64369 Tel Aviv / IL | 07 /
BLUM, Shmuel 81 Katzenelson Street Givatayim 53271 / IL | [2008/26] |
Former [2007/49] | 01 /
AUERBACH, Micha 52 Saifan Street 71908 Maccabim / IL | ||
02 /
COHEN, Rony 7 Hadolev Street 42823 Zoran / IL | |||
03 /
GOLAN, Eli 30 Kehilat Bavel Street 47322 Ramat Hasharon / IL | |||
04 /
ISENBERG, Alex 56/2 Zabotinsky Street 75277 Rishon Lezion / IL | |||
05 /
GENIN, Arcadi 12 Hachalmit Street 67420 Bat Yam / IL | |||
06 /
SENDER, Ran 23 Dobnov Street 64369 Tel Aviv / IL | |||
07 /
BLUM, Shmuel 3 Hadolev Street 42823 Zoran / IL | Representative(s) | Breesé, Pierre Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/49] | Breese, Pierre BREDEMA 38, avenue de l'Opéra 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 06711206.0 | 21.02.2006 | [2007/49] | WO2006IL00224 | Priority number, date | US20050078240 | 10.03.2005 Original published format: US 78240 | [2007/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006095331 | Date: | 14.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1862018 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/14, G08B1/08 | [2007/52] | CPC: |
G07C9/00912 (EP,US);
H04L12/28 (KR);
B65D79/02 (EP,US);
B65D90/00 (EP,US);
B65D90/008 (EP,US);
E05B39/005 (EP,US);
E05B45/005 (EP,US);
G06Q10/08 (EP,US);
G07C11/00 (EP,US);
G08B13/06 (EP,US);
B65D2203/10 (EP,US);
B65D2590/0083 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/49] | H04Q5/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTELLIGENTES BEHÄLTERÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM | [2007/49] | English: | SMART CONTAINER MONITORING SYSTEM | [2007/49] | French: | SYSTEME SERVANT A CONTROLER UN RESERVOIR AUTOMATIQUE | [2007/49] | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 10.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/49] | 06.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/19] | 17.12.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/19] | 30.12.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004113783 (YAGESH JOHN [US]) [X] 1,3-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0049] , [0051] , [0055] - [0057] - [0066] , [0067]; figures 1-7 *; | [A]WO2004077091 (ALL SET MARINE SECURITY AB [SE]) [A] 1 * abstract ** page 12, line 10 - page 14, line 12; figures 1-8 * | International search | [A]US2004066328 (GALLEY C JAMES [US], et al); | [A]US5892441 (WOOLLEY LOUIS A [US], et al); | [A]US2003164763 (HISANO ATSUSHI [US], et al); | [A]US4688244 (HANNON MARWAN [US], et al) |