EP1976747 - CONTROL DEVICE FOR A BICYCLE DERAILLEUR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CAMPAGNOLO S.R.L. Via della Chimica 4 36100 Vicenza / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states CAMPAGNOLO S.R.L. Via della Chimica 4 I-36100 Vicenza / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAL PRA'Giuseppe Via G. Verdi 11/A 36010 Zané (Vicenza) / IT | 02 /
CAIAZZO, Marco Via Longare, 60 36040 Torri di Quartesolo / IT | [2008/41] | Representative(s) | Riccardi, Elisa Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A. Via Trebbia, 20 20135 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Riccardi, Elisa Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A. Via Trebbia, 20 20135 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 06711392.8 | 23.01.2006 | [2008/41] | WO2006IT00037 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007083331 | Date: | 26.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1976747 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1976747 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B62M25/04, B62L3/02 | [2008/41] | CPC: |
B62L3/02 (EP,US);
B62K23/06 (EP,US);
B62M25/04 (EP,US);
Y10T74/2042 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20438 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERVORRICHTUNG FÜR FAHRRADKETTENSCHALTUNG | [2008/41] | English: | CONTROL DEVICE FOR A BICYCLE DERAILLEUR | [2008/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE POUR DÉRAILLEUR DE BICYCLETTE | [2008/41] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/41] | 12.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.08.2010 | BE | 18.08.2010 | CY | 18.08.2010 | CZ | 18.08.2010 | DK | 18.08.2010 | EE | 18.08.2010 | FI | 18.08.2010 | HU | 18.08.2010 | LT | 18.08.2010 | LV | 18.08.2010 | NL | 18.08.2010 | PL | 18.08.2010 | RO | 18.08.2010 | SE | 18.08.2010 | SI | 18.08.2010 | SK | 18.08.2010 | TR | 18.08.2010 | BG | 18.11.2010 | GR | 19.11.2010 | ES | 29.11.2010 | IS | 18.12.2010 | PT | 20.12.2010 | GB | 23.01.2011 | IE | 23.01.2011 | LU | 23.01.2011 | CH | 31.01.2011 | LI | 31.01.2011 | MC | 31.01.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
TR | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
GB | 23.01.2011 | ||
IE | 23.01.2011 | ||
LU | 23.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
GB | 23.01.2011 | ||
IE | 23.01.2011 | ||
LU | 23.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
GB | 23.01.2011 | ||
IE | 23.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
GB | 23.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/42] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
LT | 18.08.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3136922 (SMOLIK HANS CHRISTIAN ING GRAD) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5241878 (NAGANO MASASHI [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0601211 (MORY SUNTOUR INC [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5479776 (ROMANO ANTONIO [IT]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002104401 (DAL PRA GIUSEPPE [IT]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002124679 (DAL PRA GIUSEPPE [IT]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1440878 (SHIMANO KK [JP]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]EP1502847 (SHIMANO KK [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |