EP1842935 - ALUMINUM ALLOY PLATE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/41] | ALUMINUM ALLOY PLATE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | ||
[2014/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.2015 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KOBE SEIKO SHO 10-26, Wakinohama-cho 2-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-8585 / JP | [2007/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORISHITA, Makoto K.K. Kobe Seiko Sho Moka Plant, 15 Kinugaoka Moka-shi, Tochigi 321-4367 / JP | 02 /
MATSUMOTO, Katsushi K.K. Kobe Seiko Sho Kobe Corp.Res.Labs., 5-5, Takatsukadai 1 chome Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-2271 / JP | 03 /
YASUNAGA, Shigenobu K.K. Kobe Seiko Sho Moka Plant, 15 Kinugaoka Moka-shi, Tochigi 321-4367 / JP | 04 /
INABA, Takashi K.K. Kobe Seiko Sho Moka Plant, 15 Kinugaoka Moka-shi, Tochigi 321-4367 / JP | [2014/44] |
Former [2014/43] | 01 /
MORISHITA, Makoto, K.K. Kobe Seiko Sho Moka Plant, 15 Kinugaoka Moka-shi, Tochigi 321-4367 / JP | ||
02 /
MATSUMOTO, Katsushi, K.K. Kobe Seiko Sho Kobe Corp.Res.Labs., 5-5, Takatsukadai 1 chome Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-2271 / JP | |||
03 /
YASUNAGA, Shigenobu, K.K. Kobe Seiko Sho Moka Plant, 15 Kinugaoka Moka-shi, Tochigi 321-4367 / JP | |||
04 /
INABA, Takashi, K.K. Kobe Seiko Sho Moka Plant, 15 Kinugaoka Moka-shi, Tochigi 321-4367 / JP | |||
Former [2014/01] | 01 /
MORISHITA, Makoto, K.K. Kobe Seiko Sho Moka Plant, 15 Kinugaoka Moka-shi, Tochigi 321-4367 / JP | ||
02 /
MATSUMOTO, Katsushi, .K. Kobe Seiko Sho Kobe Corp.Res.Labs., 5-5, Takatsukadai 1 chome Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-2271 / JP | |||
03 /
YASUNAGA, Shigenobu, K.K. Kobe Seiko Sho Moka Plant, 15 Kinugaoka Moka-shi, Tochigi 321-4367 / JP | |||
04 /
INABA, Takashi, K.K. Kobe Seiko Sho Moka Plant, 15 Kinugaoka Moka-shi, Tochigi 321-4367 / JP | |||
Former [2007/51] | 01 /
MORISHITA, Makoto, K.K. Kobe Seiko Sho Moka Plant, 15 Kinogaoka Moka-shi, Tochigi 321-436 / JP | ||
02 /
MATSUMOTO, Katsushi, .K. Kobe Seiko Sho Kobe Corp.Res.Labs., 1-5, Takatsukadai, Nishi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-2271 / JP | |||
03 /
YASUNAGA, Shigenobu, K.K. Kobe Seiko Sho Moka Plant, 15 Kinogaoka Moka-shi, Tochigi 321-436 / JP | |||
04 /
INABA, Takashi, K.K. Kobe Seiko Sho Moka Plant, 15 Kinogaoka Moka-shi, Tochigi 321-436 / JP | |||
Former [2007/41] | 01 /
MORISHITA, Makoto, K.K. Kobe Seiko Sho Moka Plant, 15 Kinogaoka Moka-shi, Tochigi 321-436 / JP | ||
02 /
MATSUMOTO, K.K. Kobe Seiko Sho Kobe Corp.Res.Labs., 1-5, Takatsukadai, Nishi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-2271 / JP | |||
03 /
YASUNAGA, Shigenobu, K.K. Kobe Seiko Sho Moka Plant, 15 Kinogaoka Moka-shi, Tochigi 321-436 / JP | |||
04 /
INABA, Takashi, K.K. Kobe Seiko Sho Moka Plant, 15 Kinogaoka Moka-shi, Tochigi 321-436 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/44] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/41] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06711665.7 | 13.01.2006 | [2014/44] | WO2006JP300380 | Priority number, date | JP20050011812 | 19.01.2005 Original published format: JP 2005011812 | JP20050017236 | 25.01.2005 Original published format: JP 2005017236 | [2007/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006077779 | Date: | 27.07.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1842935 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1842935 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.07.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C22C21/06, B22D11/00, B22D11/06, C22F1/047, C22C21/08 | [2013/35] | CPC: |
B22D11/003 (EP,US);
C22C21/06 (EP,KR,US);
B22D11/0622 (EP,US);
B22D11/0682 (EP,US);
C22C21/08 (EP,US);
C22F1/047 (EP,US);
B21B2003/001 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/41] | C22C21/06, B22D11/00, B22D11/06, C22F1/047 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/41] | Title | German: | PLATTE AUS EINER ALUMINIUMLEGIERUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2014/44] | English: | ALUMINUM ALLOY PLATE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2014/44] | French: | PLAQUE EN ALLIAGE D'ALUMINIUM ET PROCEDE POUR LA FABRIQUER | [2014/44] |
Former [2007/41] | PLATTE AUS EINER ALUMINIUMLEGIERUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2007/41] | ALUMINUM ALLOY PLATE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | ||
Former [2007/41] | PLAQUE EN ALLIAGE D'ALUMINIUM ET PROCEDE POUR LA FABRIQUER | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2007 | Translation filed | 12.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2007 | Search fee paid | 12.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/41] | 23.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 18.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.01.2006 | AT | 29.10.2014 | BE | 29.10.2014 | BG | 29.10.2014 | CY | 29.10.2014 | CZ | 29.10.2014 | DK | 29.10.2014 | EE | 29.10.2014 | ES | 29.10.2014 | FI | 29.10.2014 | IT | 29.10.2014 | LT | 29.10.2014 | LV | 29.10.2014 | MC | 29.10.2014 | NL | 29.10.2014 | PL | 29.10.2014 | RO | 29.10.2014 | SE | 29.10.2014 | SI | 29.10.2014 | SK | 29.10.2014 | IE | 13.01.2015 | LU | 13.01.2015 | GB | 29.01.2015 | GR | 30.01.2015 | CH | 31.01.2015 | LI | 31.01.2015 | IS | 28.02.2015 | PT | 02.03.2015 | [2017/48] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 13.01.2006 | |
AT | 29.10.2014 | ||
BG | 29.10.2014 | ||
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
IE | 13.01.2015 | ||
LU | 13.01.2015 | ||
GB | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
IE | 13.01.2015 | ||
LU | 13.01.2015 | ||
GB | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
IE | 13.01.2015 | ||
LU | 13.01.2015 | ||
GB | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/48] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
LU | 13.01.2015 | ||
GB | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
LU | 13.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/43] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
LU | 13.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
LU | 13.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/34] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 29.10.2014 | |
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 29.10.2014 | |
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 29.10.2014 | |
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 29.10.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4626294 (SANDERS JR ROBERT E [US]) [A] 1-5* claims 1-27 *; | [X]EP0610006 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5 * examples 1,2, 4, 6,; tables 1-4, 7, 8, 11-14 * * claims 1-19 *; | [XD]JPH07252571 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [XD] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [X]RU2111826 (ZHIVODEROV VIKTOR MAKAR EVICH, et al) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0846781 (SUMITOMO LIGHT METAL IND [JP]) [X] 1-5 * claims 1-4 * * table 1 *; | [X]JPH10259441 (SUMITOMO LIGHT METAL IND) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2001032031 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]WO03027345 (ASSAN DEMIR VE SAC SANAYI A S [TR], et al) [A] 1-5 * claims 1-10 * |