EP1845455 - DOWNLOAD CONTROL OF INFORMATION FROM SERVER CONNECTED TO NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/42] | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMA, Toshihiro c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION, 3-5, Owa 3-chome, Suw a-shi, Nagano, 3928502 / JP | [2007/42] | Representative(s) | Cloughley, Peter Andrew Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/42] | Cloughley, Peter Andrew Miller Sturt Kenyon, 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 06711697.0 | 10.01.2006 | [2007/42] | WO2006JP300416 | Priority number, date | JP20050009990 | 18.01.2005 Original published format: JP 2005009990 | JP20050009988 | 18.01.2005 Original published format: JP 2005009988 | JP20050046570 | 23.02.2005 Original published format: JP 2005046570 | [2007/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006077783 | Date: | 27.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1845455 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.07.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/12, H04L29/08 | [2009/18] | CPC: |
G06F3/1214 (EP);
G06F3/1229 (EP);
G06F3/1236 (EP);
G06F3/126 (EP);
G06F3/1288 (EP);
H04L67/56 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2007/42] | G06F13/00, B41J29/38, G06F3/12, G06F9/445 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERUNTERLADESTEUERUNG VON INFORMATIONEN VON EINEM MIT NETZWERK VERBUNDENEN SERVER | [2007/42] | English: | DOWNLOAD CONTROL OF INFORMATION FROM SERVER CONNECTED TO NETWORK | [2007/42] | French: | CONTROLE DE TÉLÉCHARGEMENT D'INFORMATIONS D'UN SERVEUR CONNECTÉ À UN RÉSEAU | [2007/42] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2007 | Translation filed | 23.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2007 | Search fee paid | 23.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/42] | 02.06.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP2003186785 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [AD] 1-36* the whole document *; | [AD]JP2004185351 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [AD] 1-36 * the whole document *; | [X] - KACZMAREK, STEVEN D., Microsoft Systems Management Server 2003 Administrator's Companion, ch. 12, MICROSOFT PRESS, (20040121), XP002519954 [X] 1-36 * page 3, paragraph TERMINOLOGY - page 4 * * page 28 - page 30 * * page 33 - page 37 * * page 39 - page 42 * * page 44 * * page 48 * * page 52 - page 53 * |