EP1850628 - BONE-CONDUCTION SPEAKER SET, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, ELECTRONIC TRANSLATION SYSTEM, AUDITORY SENSATION SYSTEM, NAVIGATION DEVICE, AND PORTABLE TELEPHONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akita Electronics Systems Co., Ltd. 85, Aza Ushirono, Aikawa, Yuwa-machi Kawabe-gun Akita 010-1231 / JP | For all designated states Kato, Toru 18-4, Aza-Yachioki, Hiro-omote Akita-shi, Akita, 0100041 / JP | For all designated states Masaki, Masakazu 6-8-3, Chuo, Tsuchizakiminato Akita-shi, Akita, 0110946 / JP | [2007/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOMATSU, Takashi Akita Electronics Systems Co. Ltd. 85, Aza-Ushiron o, Yuwa-aikawa, Akita-shi, Akita, 010123 / JP | 02 /
KATO, Toru 18-4, Aza-Yachioki, Hiro-omote Akita-shi, Akita 0100041 / JP | 03 /
MASAKI, Masakazu 6-8-3, Chuo, Tsuchizakiminato Akita-shi, Akita, 0110946 / JP | [2007/44] | Representative(s) | Brötz, Helmut, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Yale-Allee 26 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/44] | Brötz, Helmut, et al Rieder & Partner, Corneliusstrasse 45 42329 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 06712658.1 | 31.01.2006 | [2007/44] | WO2006JP301515 | Priority number, date | JP20050024311 | 31.01.2005 Original published format: JP 2005024311 | [2007/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006080517 | Date: | 03.08.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1850628 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.08.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/00, H04R1/04, H04R3/00, H04R1/10 | [2012/40] | CPC: |
H04R1/1091 (EP,KR,US);
H04R1/1041 (EP,KR,US);
H04R5/033 (EP,KR,US);
H04R2201/107 (EP,KR,US);
H04R2460/13 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/44] | H04R1/00, H04R1/04, H04R3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KNOCHENLEITUNGS-LAUTSPRECHERSET, ELEKTRONISCHE EINRICHTUNG, ELEKTRONISCHES ÜBERSETZUNGSSYSTEM, GEHÖR-WAHRNEHMUNGSSYSTEM, NAVIGATIONSEINRICHTUNG UND TRAGBARES TELEFON | [2007/44] | English: | BONE-CONDUCTION SPEAKER SET, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, ELECTRONIC TRANSLATION SYSTEM, AUDITORY SENSATION SYSTEM, NAVIGATION DEVICE, AND PORTABLE TELEPHONE | [2007/44] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE HAUT-PARLEURS A CONDUCTION OSSEUSE, APPAREIL ELECTRONIQUE, SYSTEME DE TRADUCTION ELECTRONIQUE, SYSTEME DE SENSATION AUDITIVE, APPAREIL DE NAVIGATION ET TELEPHONE PORTABLE | [2007/44] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2007 | Translation filed | 01.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2007 | Search fee paid | 01.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/44] | 01.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/04] | 06.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0207477 (MATECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * page 21, line 29 - page 23, line 10 * * page 31, line 22 - page 32, line 6 * * figures 14,26,27; claim 14 *; | [A]JP2004064457 (KATO TORU, et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0671862 (SOEI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 3 - page 1, line 45 * * column 2, line 26 - column 3, line 30 * * figures 1-3 * |