EP1852101 - BIOPHOTON MEASURING INSTRUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2016 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HITACHI MEDICAL CORPORATION 4-14-1, Sotokanda Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0021 / JP | [2015/28] |
Former [2007/45] | For all designated states HITACHI MEDICAL CORPORATION 1-14, Uchikanda-1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0047 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWASAKI, Shingo 5-165-1-B32, Rokkoudai Matsudo-shi, Chiba, 2702203 / JP | 02 /
TANAKA, Naoki, Advanced Res. Lab., Hitachi Ltd 25 20 Akanuma Hatoyama-cho Hiki-gun, Saitama 3500321 / JP | [2015/36] |
Former [2007/45] | 01 /
KAWASAKI, Shingo 5-165-1-B32, Rokkoudai Matsudo-shi, Chiba, 2702203 / JP | ||
02 /
TANAKA, Naoki, Advanced Res. Lab., Hitachi Ltd 25 20 Akanuma, Hatoyama-cho Hiki-gun, Saitama 3500321 / JP | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2015/36] |
Former [2007/45] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06712863.7 | 02.02.2006 | [2007/45] | WO2006JP301720 | Priority number, date | JP20050039450 | 16.02.2005 Original published format: JP 2005039450 | [2007/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006087915 | Date: | 24.08.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1852101 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1852101 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.08.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/1455, A61B10/00, G01N21/17, G01N21/35 | [2008/03] | CPC: |
A61B5/0059 (EP,US);
A61B5/14546 (EP,US);
G01N21/4795 (EP,US);
A61B5/14553 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/45] | A61K6/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2015/36] |
Former [2008/21] | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BIOPHOTONEN-MESSINSTRUMENT | [2007/45] | English: | BIOPHOTON MEASURING INSTRUMENT | [2007/45] | French: | INSTRUMENT DE MESURE BIOPHOTONIQUE | [2007/45] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2007 | Translation filed | 13.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2007 | Search fee paid | 13.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/45] | 17.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 21.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 02.09.2015 | NL | 02.09.2015 | FR | 29.02.2016 | [2017/10] |
Former [2016/22] | IT | 02.09.2015 | |
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | IT | 02.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004171919 (MAKI ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,12 * paragraphs [0009] , [0028] , [0031] * * figures 1,2,4-9 *; | [X]US2004242979 (KAWASAKI SHINGO [JP]) [X] 1-16 * paragraphs [0023] , [0025] , [0027] , [0032] , [0046] , [0047] , [0049] * * figures 1,2,4-6 *; | [E]EP1685801 (HITACHI MEDICAL CORP [JP]) [E] 1-5,8-16* paragraphs [0006] , [0015] , [0019] , [0023] , [0025] , [0039] , [0040] , [0042] , [0051]; figures 1-4,6,8,9 * |