EP1844773 - PERCUTANEOUS ABSORPTION PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyorin Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 5, Kandasurugadai 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8311 / JP | For all designated states ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 1-5, Doshomachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8526 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/42] | For all designated states KYORIN PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 5, Kandasurugadai 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8311 / JP | ||
For all designated states ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 1-5, Doshomachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8526 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Koichi 6-13, Yamashirocho 1-chome, Yao-shi Osaka, 581080 / JP | 02 /
SAKAI, Yoshiki c/o ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD., 1-1, Sakurai 3-c home, Shimamoto-cho, Mishima-gun, Osaka / JP | [2007/42] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/14] | Goldbach, Klara, et al Grünecker Kinkeldey Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/41] | Schön, Christoph, et al Kroher.Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/42] | Henkel, Feiler & Hänzel Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06712902.3 | 02.02.2006 | [2007/42] | WO2006JP301759 | Priority number, date | JP20050027826 | 03.02.2005 Original published format: JP 2005027826 | [2007/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006082888 | Date: | 10.08.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1844773 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.08.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4164, A61K9/70, A61K47/06, A61K47/10, A61K47/12, A61K47/14, A61K47/16, A61K47/22, A61K47/32, A61K47/46, A61P1/00, A61P11/00, A61P11/06, A61P13/02 | [2007/42] | CPC: |
A61K9/7053 (EP,US);
A61K9/70 (KR);
A61K31/4164 (EP,US);
A61K47/32 (KR);
A61K47/46 (KR);
A61K9/7069 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/12 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P13/06 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUBEREITUNG MIT PERKUTANER ABSORPTION | [2007/42] | English: | PERCUTANEOUS ABSORPTION PREPARATION | [2007/42] | French: | PREPARATION POUR ABSORPTION PERCUTANEE | [2007/42] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2007 | Translation filed | 02.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2007 | Search fee paid | 02.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/42] | 25.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/15] | 21.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.10.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO2005011683 (KYORIN SEIYAKU KK [JP], et al)[XP] 1-5,9,11,13-18; | [E]EP1652523 (KYORIN SEIYAKU KK [JP], et al) [E] 1-5,9,11,13-18 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraphs [0022] , [0027] , [0030] * * paragraph [0053] * * example - * * claim - *; | [I] - HEGDE S S ET AL, "ANTIMUSCARINICS FOR THE TREATMENT OF OVERACTIVE BLADDER: CURRENT OPTIONS AND EMERGING THERAPIES", CURRENT OPINION IN INVESTIGATIONAL DRUGS, PHARMAPRESS, US, (20040101), vol. 5, no. 1, ISSN 1472-4472, pages 40 - 49, XP008061336 [I] 1-19 * abstract * * page 41, column r, paragraph 2 - page 42, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 42, column r, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 44, column r, paragraph 5 * * table 2 * | [A] - NITTI VICTOR W, "Transdermal therapy for overactive bladder: present and future", REVIEWS IN UROLOGY, MEDREVIEWS, NEW YORK, US, (20030101), vol. 5, no. suppl. 8, ISSN 1523-6161, pages S31 - S36, XP009106654 [A] 1-19 * abstract * * page S33, column l, paragraph 2 - column m, paragraph 3 * * page S33, column m, paragraph l - page S34, column l, paragraph 1 * * page S34, column l, paragraph 2 * * page S36, column l, paragraph l - column m, paragraph 1 * |