EP1859140 - CONTROL APPARATUS FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2007/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARAKI, Koji c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi, 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
SHOGENJI, Yoshiyuki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi, 471-8571 / JP | [2007/48] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2007/48] | Kuhnen & Wacker Intellectual Property Law Firm Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 06712965.0 | 27.01.2006 | [2007/48] | WO2006JP301822 | Priority number, date | JP20050078359 | 18.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005078359 | [2007/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006100836 | Date: | 28.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1859140 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1859140 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/02 | [2007/48] | CPC: |
F02D37/02 (EP,US);
F02D41/0255 (EP,US);
F02D41/3094 (EP,US);
F02P5/1502 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2008/26] |
Former [2007/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR | [2007/48] | English: | CONTROL APPARATUS FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2007/48] | French: | APPAREIL DE COMMANDE POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2007/48] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/48] | 16.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |