EP1846279 - VEHICLE FRONT-PART STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.11.2010 [2010/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/43] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARUYAMA, Hiroto c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi, 4718571 / JP | 02 /
SEKI, Kazuhiro c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi, 4718571 / JP | [2007/43] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Bavariaring 10 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/43] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Bavariaring 10 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06713246.4 | 01.02.2006 | [2007/43] | WO2006JP302103 | Priority number, date | JP20050029674 | 04.02.2005 Original published format: JP 2005029674 | [2007/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006082991 | Date: | 10.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1846279 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1846279 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B62D21/15 | [2007/43] | CPC: |
B62D21/152 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/10] |
Former [2007/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGVORDERTEILSTRUKTUR | [2007/43] | English: | VEHICLE FRONT-PART STRUCTURE | [2007/43] | French: | STRUCTURE DE L'AVANT D'UN VEHICULE | [2007/43] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/43] | 04.09.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.10.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |