EP1847954 - INFORMATION PROVIDING DEVICE, AND INFORMATION PROVIDING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.03.2014 [2014/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/43] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAITO, Hirohisa c/o FUJITSU LIMITED, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Na kahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa, 2118588 / JP | 02 /
UEDA, Akinobu c/o FUJITSU LIMITED, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Na kahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa, 2118588 / JP | [2007/43] | Representative(s) | Stebbing, Timothy Charles Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/43] | Stebbing, Timothy Charles Haseltine Lake Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06713501.2 | 10.02.2006 | [2007/43] | WO2006JP302358 | Priority number, date | WO2005JP02080 | 10.02.2005 Original published format: PCT/JP2005/002080 | [2007/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006092945 | Date: | 08.09.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1847954 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.09.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q50/00, G09G5/00, G06Q30/00 | [2010/44] | CPC: |
G06F3/011 (EP);
G06F3/0481 (EP);
G06Q30/00 (EP);
G06Q30/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/43] | G06Q50/00, G09G5/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2007/51] |
Former [2007/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON INFORMATIONEN UND SYSTEM ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON INFORMATIONEN | [2007/43] | English: | INFORMATION PROVIDING DEVICE, AND INFORMATION PROVIDING SYSTEM | [2007/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FOURNITURE D'INFORMATIONS ET SYSTÈME DE FOURNITURE D' INFORMATIONS | [2007/43] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2007 | Translation filed | 06.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2007 | Search fee paid | 06.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/43] | 20.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.11.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed |