EP1847558 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING RING-OPENING METATHESIS POLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.02.2011 [2011/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KURARAY CO., LTD. 1621 Sakazu Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 710-8622 / JP | [2007/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWASAKI, Hideharu c/o KURARAY CO., LTD., 2045-1, Sakazu, Kurashiki-s hi, Okayama, 7108691 / JP | 02 /
INUBUSHI, Yasutaka c/o KURARAY CO., LTD., 2045-1, Sakazu, Kurashiki-s hi, Okayama, 7108691 / JP | [2007/43] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/43] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06713569.9 | 07.02.2006 | [2007/43] | WO2006JP302427 | Priority number, date | JP20050032200 | 08.02.2005 Original published format: JP 2005032200 | JP20050032304 | 08.02.2005 Original published format: JP 2005032304 | JP20050032360 | 08.02.2005 Original published format: JP 2005032360 | [2007/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006085642 | Date: | 17.08.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1847558 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.08.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C08G61/08 | [2007/43] | CPC: |
C08G61/08 (EP,US);
C08K5/13 (EP,US);
C08K5/50 (EP,US);
C08K5/526 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES RINGÖFFNUNGSMETATHESE-POLYMERS | [2007/43] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING RING-OPENING METATHESIS POLYMER | [2007/43] | French: | PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE UN POLYMERE DE METATHESE AVEC OUVERTURE DE CYCLE | [2007/43] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2007 | Translation filed | 09.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2007 | Search fee paid | 09.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/43] | 20.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/06] | 22.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9720865 (ADVANCED POLYMER TECHNOLOGIES [US]) [X] 1-5,11 * page 7, line 27 - page 10, line 12 * * page 11, line 16 - line 24 * * page 15, line 23 - page 16, line 5 * * page 19, line 15 - page 21, line 14 *; | [X]CA2246789 (SMITH CORP A O [US]) [X] 1-5,11 * claims 1-5 * * abstract * * page 1, line 10 - page 2, line 35; example 1 *; | [X]WO0046256 (ADVANCED POLYMER TECHNOLOGIES [US]) [X] 1-11 * page 2, line 1 - line 28; examples 1-4 *; | [X]US2003144437 (BELL ANDREW [US], et al) [X] 1-5,11 * paragraphs [0157] , [0177] , [0178]; examples 9-36 *; | JP2003335845 [ ] (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [ ] * paragraphs [0015] , [0026] , [0037] , [0042] - [0047] *; | [X]WO2004069895 (ZEON CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-11 * examples 1,2,4,5,7 *; | [PX]EP1589055 (ZEON CORP [JP]) [PX] 1-11* paragraphs [0046] - [0051] - [0069] , [0130] - [0134]; examples 1,2,4,5,7 *; | [X] - SUZUKI, MASAHIRO ET AL, "Metathesis-polymerizable norbornene-based cycloolefin polymers and composition thereof", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20031128), Database accession no. 2003:929605, URL: STN, XP002493644 [X] 1-11 * abstract * | Examination | JP2000309628 |