EP1857301 - METHOD FOR PREDICTING ABRASION OF TIRE, METHOD FOR DESIGNING TIRE, METHOD FOR PRODUCING TIRE, AND SYSTEM AND PROGRAM FOR PREDICTING ABRASION OF TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2010 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.09.2010 [2010/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO., LTD. 36-11, Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8685 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/47] | For all designated states THE YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO., LTD. 36-11, Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8685 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIYASHITA, Naoshi C/O The Yokohama Rubber Co., LTD. Hiratsuka Factor y, 2-1, Oiwake, Hiratsuka City, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
KABE, Kazuyuki C/O The Yokohama Rubber Co., LTD. Hiratsuka Factor y, 2-1, Oiwake, Hiratsuka City, Kanagawa / JP | [2007/47] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/47] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06714167.1 | 21.02.2006 | [2007/47] | WO2006JP303027 | Priority number, date | JP20050047068 | 23.02.2005 Original published format: JP 2005047068 | [2007/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006090686 | Date: | 31.08.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1857301 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1857301 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.08.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60C19/00 | [2007/47] | CPC: |
B60C19/00 (EP,US);
B60C11/246 (EP,US);
B60C99/006 (EP,US);
B60T2210/12 (EP,US);
B60T2230/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2008/15] |
Former [2007/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VORHERSAGE DES ABRIEBS EINES REIFENS, VERFAHREN ZUM ENTWURF EINES REIFENS, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINEN REIFEN SOWIE SYSTEM UND PROGRAMM ZUR VORHERSAGE DES ABRIEBS EINES REIFENS | [2007/47] | English: | METHOD FOR PREDICTING ABRASION OF TIRE, METHOD FOR DESIGNING TIRE, METHOD FOR PRODUCING TIRE, AND SYSTEM AND PROGRAM FOR PREDICTING ABRASION OF TIRE | [2007/47] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREVISION D ABRASION D UN PNEU, PROCEDE DE CONCEPTION DU PNEU, PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DU PNEU ET SYSTEME ET PROGRAMME DE PREVISION D ABRASION DU PNEU | [2007/47] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2007 | Translation filed | 22.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2007 | Search fee paid | 22.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/47] | 25.09.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.11.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 16.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed |