EP1852585 - EXHAUST HEAT RECOVERY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sango Co., Ltd. 1-1, Aza Miyashita, Oaza Fukuta Miyoshi-cho Nishikamo-gun, Aichi 470-0294 / JP | [2007/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASE, Shuichi c/o Yawatayama Kojo, SANGO CO., LTD. 5-35, Aza Ya watayama, Oaza Miyoshi, Miyoshi-cho Nishikamo-gun, Aichi, 4700224 / JP | [2012/15] |
Former [2011/24] | 01 /
HASE, Shuichi c/o Yawatayama Kojo, SANGO CO., LTD. 5-35, Aza Ya watayama, Oaza Miyoshi, Miyoshi-cho Nishikamo-gun, Aichi, 4700224 / JP | ||
Former [2007/45] | 01 /
HASE, Shuichi c/o Yawatayama Kojo, SANGO CO., LTD. -5-35, Aza Ya watayama, Oaza Miyoshi, Miyoshi-cho Nishikamo-gun, Aichi, 4700224 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2012/15] |
Former [2007/45] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06714275.2 | 22.02.2006 | [2007/45] | WO2006JP303135 | Priority number, date | JP20050087052 | 23.02.2005 Original published format: JP 2005087052 | [2007/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006090725 | Date: | 31.08.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1852585 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1852585 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.08.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F01N13/08 | [2011/21] | CPC: |
F01N5/02 (EP,US);
F01N2240/02 (EP,US);
F01N2240/36 (EP,US);
F01N2410/02 (EP,US);
F01N2410/14 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/45] | F01N5/02, F01N7/08 | Designated contracting states | DE [2008/22] |
Former [2007/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ABGASWÄRMERÜCKGEWINNUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2007/45] | English: | EXHAUST HEAT RECOVERY DEVICE | [2007/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RECUPERATION DE CHALEUR DE GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT | [2011/21] |
Former [2007/45] | DISPOSITIF DE RECUPERATION DE CHALEUR DE REJET | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2007 | Translation filed | 22.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2007 | Search fee paid | 22.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/45] | 14.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 29.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/12] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 29.11.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 29.11.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.02.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0885758 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 14 - column 4, line 44 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO2004046516 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE], et al) [A] 2,3* the whole document *; | [A]EP1426602 (CALSONIC KANSEI CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0070] * * claim 8 * * figure 1 * |