EP1865614 - CODE SERIES TRANSMITTING METHOD, RADIO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, TRANSMITTER, AND RECEIVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2018/25] | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | ||
Former [2007/50] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KURODA, Nahoko c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo, 1080014 / JP | 02 /
LEE, Jinsock c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo, 1080014 / JP | [2018/25] |
Former [2007/50] | 01 /
KURODA, Nahoko c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo, 1080014 / JP | ||
02 /
LEE, Jinsock c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo, 1080014 / JP | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/25] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2007/50] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06714703.3 | 27.02.2006 | [2007/50] | WO2006JP303566 | Priority number, date | JP20050049908 | 25.02.2005 Original published format: JP 2005049908 | [2007/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006090872 | Date: | 31.08.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1865614 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1865614 | Date: | 20.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.08.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/707, H04B7/26 | [2015/15] | CPC: |
H04B1/707 (EP,KR,US);
H04J13/16 (KR);
H04W72/0446 (KR);
H04W72/0466 (KR);
H04W72/53 (KR);
H04W52/325 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/50] | H04B1/707 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2018/25] |
Former [2008/14] | DE, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | CODEREIHEN-SENDEVERFAHREN, FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, SENDER UND EMPFÄNGER | [2007/50] | English: | CODE SERIES TRANSMITTING METHOD, RADIO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, TRANSMITTER, AND RECEIVER | [2007/50] | French: | MÉTHODE DE TRANSMISSION DE SÉRIES DE CODES, ÉMETTEUR, RÉCEPTEUR ET SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION RADIO | [2007/50] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2007 | Translation filed | 24.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2007 | Search fee paid | 24.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 26.09.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.11.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 28.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.05.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 11.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.11.2017 | Opposition(s) | 21.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 20.06.2018 | FR | 28.02.2019 | [2020/13] |
Former [2019/12] | IT | 20.06.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB2380105 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,12-14 * abstract *[A] 2-11; | [XA] - NTT DOCOMO, "Time multiplexing of Scheduling Information with CQI", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-041209, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20040916), vol. RAN WG1, no. Seoul, Korea; 20040916, XP050099404 [X] 1,12-14 * Section 4 * [A] 2-11 |