EP1909493 - PHOTOGRAPHING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/15] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAKU, Toshihiko c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 798, Miyanodai, Kai sei-machi, Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa 25 / JP | 02 /
SHIRATA, Masashi c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 798, Miyanodai, Kai sei-machi, Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa 25 / JP | 03 /
KUBO, Masahiro c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 798, Miyanodai, Kai sei-machi, Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa 25 / JP | [2008/15] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/52] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/15] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06715408.8 | 08.03.2006 | [2008/15] | WO2006JP304488 | Priority number, date | JP20050067929 | 10.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005067929 | JP20050067943 | 10.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005067943 | [2008/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006095779 | Date: | 14.09.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1909493 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1909493 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.09.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/272, G06T3/00, H04N5/238, H04N9/74 | [2008/15] | CPC: |
H04N5/272 (EP,US);
H04N1/3878 (EP,US);
H04N1/6027 (EP,US);
H04N1/624 (EP,US);
H04N9/646 (EP,US);
H04N9/74 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/25] |
Former [2008/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | FOTOGRAFIERSYSTEM | [2008/15] | English: | PHOTOGRAPHING SYSTEM | [2008/15] | French: | SYSTEME DE PHOTOGRAPHIE | [2008/15] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2008 | Translation filed | 26.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2006 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 31.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 13.02.2008 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 03.03.2008 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 11.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 26.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9426057 (SCIENT GENERICS LTD [GB], et al); | [X]EP0756419 (JAPAN BROADCASTING CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]EP1100262 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]); | [X]US6490006 (MONJO YOSHIO [JP]) |