EP1860157 - PROCESSED PIGMENT AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAKATA INX CORPORATION 23-37, Edobori 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0002 / JP | [2007/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITOH, Kazunori, SAKATA INX CORP. 23-37, Edobori 1-chome, Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka, 550 0002 / JP | 02 /
HAYASHI, Akira, Sakata Inx Corp. 23-37, Edobori 1-chome, Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka, 5500002 / JP | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/48] | 01 /
ITOH, Kazunori c/o SAKATA INX CORP., 23-37, Edobori 1-chome, Nish i-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka, 5500002 / JP | ||
02 /
HAYASHI, Akira c/o SAKATA INX CORP., 23-37, Edobori 1-chome, Nish i-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka, 5500002 / JP | Representative(s) | Hart-Davis, Jason, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/48] | Hart Davis, Jason, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06715601.8 | 13.03.2006 | [2007/48] | WO2006JP304878 | Priority number, date | JP20050070812 | 14.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005070812 | [2007/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006098261 | Date: | 21.09.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1860157 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C09B67/04, B01F7/30, C09B67/46, C09C3/04, C09C3/06, C09D17/00, G02B5/20 | [2007/48] | CPC: |
C09C1/56 (EP,US);
C09B67/0002 (EP,KR,US);
B01F27/95 (EP,KR,US);
C09B67/0022 (EP,US);
C09C3/06 (EP,KR,US);
C09D11/322 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/25] |
Former [2007/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONFEKTIONIERTES PIGMENT UND SEINE VERWENDUNG | [2007/48] | English: | PROCESSED PIGMENT AND USE THEREOF | [2007/48] | French: | PIGMENT TRANSFORME ET SON UTILISATION | [2007/48] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2007 | Translation filed | 24.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2007 | Search fee paid | 24.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/48] | 01.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/16] | 10.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |