EP1863398 - WIRELESS RECHARGER FOR BACK FILLER ON ENDODONTIC TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BNL Biotech Co., Ltd. 412 Cheongsong Plaza 1136-1, Sanbon-dong, Gunpo-si Gyeonggi-do 435-040 / KR | [2007/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, In-Whan 211-505 Hyundai Apt., Apgujeong-dong, Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-110 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Cheol-Su 103-302 Kukdong Apt. Simgok-dong, Seo-gu Incheon / KR | 03 /
BAEK, Seung-Ho 82-104 Hyundai Apt., Apgujeong-dong, Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-110 / KR | [2008/29] |
Former [2007/50] | 01 /
LEE, In-Whan 211-505 Hyundai Apt., Apgujeong-dong, Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-110 / KR | ||
02 /
KIM, Cheol-Su 259-4 Simgok-dong, Seo-gu Incheon 404-190 / KR | |||
03 /
BAEK, Seung-Ho 82-104 Hyundai Apt., Apgujeong-dong, Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-110 / KR | Representative(s) | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/50] | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06716127.3 | 27.02.2006 | [2007/50] | WO2006KR00677 | Priority number, date | KR20050025676 | 28.03.2005 Original published format: KR 20050025676 | [2007/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006104315 | Date: | 05.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1863398 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.10.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61C5/04 | [2007/50] | CPC: |
A61C5/50 (EP,US);
A61C2204/002 (EP);
A61C5/55 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSES LADEGERÄT ZUR RÜCKFÜLLUNG BEI ENDODONTISCHER BEHANDLUNG | [2007/50] | English: | WIRELESS RECHARGER FOR BACK FILLER ON ENDODONTIC TREATMENT | [2007/50] | French: | FOULOIR SANS FIL POUR OBTURATION ITERATIVE EN TRAITEMENT ENDODONTIQUE | [2007/50] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 02.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 18.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/09] | 10.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.09.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.07.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 12.07.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0017318 (AMERICAN HOSPITAL SUPPLY CORP [US]) [Y] 1-13 * page 1, line 2 - line 6 ** page 1, line 23 - line 27 *; | [Y]EP0285069 (DENTSPLY INT INC [US]) [Y] 1-13 * abstract * * column 5, line 23 - line 27 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]WO0162174 (MEGADENT ENDO PRODUCTS B V [NL], et al) [Y] 1-13 * abstract * * page 3, line 28 - page 4, line 5 * * page 5, line 20 - line 22 * * figures 1,3,3a * | International search | [A]US6270343 (MARTIN HOWARD [US]); | [A]US5893713 (GARMAN GARY [US], et al); | [A]US2004009452 (OH SUK SONG [KR]) | by applicant | WO0162174 | EP0285069 | EP0017318 | US4960132 |