EP1861891 - METHOD OF ESTIMATING AVAILABLE POWER FOR HEV BATTERY PACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2015 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 20, Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-gu, Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2007/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Do-Youn RM.104, Sejong Villa, 349-12 Galma-dong Seo-gu Daejeon 302-170 / KR | 02 /
JUNG, Do-Yang 192, Haengjeong-ri Hyangnam-myeon Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-926 / KR | [2014/33] |
Former [2007/49] | 01 /
KIM, Do-Youn RM.104, Sejong Villa, 349-12 Galma-dong, Seo-gu Daejeon 302-170 / KR | ||
02 /
JUNG, Do-Yang 192, Haengjeong-ri Hyangnam-myeon, Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-926 / KR | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2007/49] | Pöpping, Barbara Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06716181.0 | 03.03.2006 | [2007/49] | WO2006KR00731 | Priority number, date | KR20050018037 | 04.03.2005 Original published format: KR 20050018037 | [2007/49] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006107140 | Date: | 12.10.2006 | Language: | KO | [2006/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1861891 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1861891 | Date: | 13.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.10.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/44 | [2014/13] | CPC: |
H01M10/44 (EP,KR,US);
B60L3/0046 (KR,US);
B60L58/14 (EP,KR,US);
B60L58/15 (EP,KR,US);
G01R31/006 (EP,KR,US);
G01R31/3832 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/48 (KR);
H02J7/00302 (EP,KR,US);
H02J7/00306 (EP,KR,US);
H02J7/0048 (EP,KR,US);
H02J7/14 (EP,KR);
B60L2240/12 (EP,KR,US);
B60L2240/545 (EP,KR,US);
B60L2240/547 (EP,KR,US);
B60L2240/549 (EP,KR,US);
B60L2240/662 (EP,KR,US);
B60L2260/44 (EP,KR,US);
H01M2220/20 (KR);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR);
Y02T10/70 (EP,KR,US);
Y02T10/72 (EP,KR,US);
Y02T90/16 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/47] | G01R31/36, H02J7/14 | ||
Former IPC [2007/49] | H01M10/44 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/24] |
Former [2007/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SCHÄTZUNG DER VERFÜGBAREN LEISTUNG FÜR EIN HEV-BATTERIEPACK | [2007/49] | English: | METHOD OF ESTIMATING AVAILABLE POWER FOR HEV BATTERY PACK | [2007/49] | French: | PROCEDE D'ESTIMATION DE PUISSANCE DISPONIBLE POUR BLOC-PILES DE VEHICULE ELECTRIQUE HYBRIDE | [2007/49] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2006 | Translation filed | 19.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2007 | Search fee paid | 19.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/49] | 09.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.03.2014 | 07.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2006135192 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [E] 1-5* page 4, line 1 - page 6, line 8 * | International search | [A]US6518732 (PALANISAMY THIRUMALAI G [US]); | [A]US6661201 (UEDA TOSHIFUMI [JP], et al); | [A]KR20040017628 (HYUNDAI MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]KR20050017478 (HYUNDAI MOTOR CO LTD) |