EP1957885 - DUAL PIPE HEAT EXCHANGER OF BOILER FOR HOUSE HEATING AND HOT WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.03.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.04.2014 [2014/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyungdong Everon Co., Ltd 233, Donsan-ri, Angseong-myeon Chungju-si, Chungcheongbuk-do 380-863 / KR | [2008/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIN, Tae-sik Seohee Villa 202 79-11, Heukseok-dong, Dongjak-gu Seoul 156-858 / KR | [2008/34] | Representative(s) | Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Fuchs Patentanwälte Söhnleinstraße 8 D-65201 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 06716316.2 | 10.03.2006 | [2008/34] | WO2006KR00866 | Priority number, date | KR20050111632 | 22.11.2005 Original published format: KR 20050111632 | [2008/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007061158 | Date: | 31.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1957885 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 31.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F24H9/12 | [2008/34] | CPC: |
F24H1/52 (EP,US);
F24H1/526 (EP,KR,US);
F24H9/0015 (KR);
F24H9/0036 (EP,KR,US);
F24H9/13 (KR);
F28D2021/0024 (KR);
Y02B30/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/34] | Title | German: | DOPPELROHRWÄRMETAUSCHER FÜR KESSEL FÜR GEBÄUDEHEIZUNG UND HEISSES WASSER | [2008/34] | English: | DUAL PIPE HEAT EXCHANGER OF BOILER FOR HOUSE HEATING AND HOT WATER | [2008/34] | French: | ECHANGEUR THERMIQUE DE CHAUDIERE A DOUBLE CANALISATION POUR LE CHAUFFAGE DOMESTIQUE ET L'EAU CHAUDE | [2008/34] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2008 | Search fee paid | 19.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 01.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/17] | 04.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]KR850001607Y (CHAE SOK DAE [KR]); | [A]JP2000146299 (TOKYO GAS CO LTD); | [A]KR20010007413 (RINNAI KK); | [A]KR20030097212 (SEOUL METAL IND CO LTD [KR]) |