EP1868726 - A SHELL FOR A GYRATORY CRUSHER AS WELL AS A GYRATORY CRUSHER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.06.2012 [2012/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sandvik Intellectual Property AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/52] | For all designated states Sandvik Intellectual Property AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NILSSON-WULFF, Torbjörn Holmagatan 43 233 42 Svedala / SE | 02 /
TRULSSON, Christian Rådmansgatan 3 211 46 Malmö / SE | 03 /
BERN, Richard Lupingatan 1 233 38 Svedala / SE | 04 /
LOVEN, Björn Bodekullsgatan 33A 214 40 Malmö / SE | 05 /
SILFVER, Rolf Bergtallsvägen 9 231 76 Beddingestrand / SE | [2007/52] | Application number, filing date | 06717005.0 | 13.03.2006 | [2007/52] | WO2006SE00320 | Priority number, date | SE20050000660 | 24.03.2005 Original published format: SE 0500660 | [2007/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006101432 | Date: | 28.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1868726 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1868726 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 28.09.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B02C2/04 | [2007/52] | CPC: |
B02C2/005 (EP,US);
B02C2/04 (EP,SE,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, TR [2008/27] |
Former [2007/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEHÄUSE FÜR EINEN KREISELBRECHER SOWIE KREISELBRECHER | [2007/52] | English: | A SHELL FOR A GYRATORY CRUSHER AS WELL AS A GYRATORY CRUSHER | [2007/52] | French: | ENVELOPPE POUR BROYEUR GIRATOIRE, ET BROYEUR GIRATOIRE CORRESPONDANT | [2007/52] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 24.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/52] | 23.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2007305 (SCHMITZ ALFRED) | International search | [A]US4582267 (KOHLER HORST-DIETMAR [DE]); | [A]US4697745 (SAWANT ULHAS S [US], et al); | [A]EP0567077 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]); | [A]US2002088887 (DAVIS DALE C [US], et al) |