EP1848893 - PNEUMATIC DEVICE HAVING A SELECTIVELY VARIABLE ORIFICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL LLC K-Annex, 8100 West Florissant Avenue St. Louis, MO 63136 / US | [2007/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAARDER, Barry, L. 27450 Pickering Drive Marshalltown, IA 50158 / US | 02 /
BURR, Ronald 1004 Fremont Street Marshalltown, IA 50158 / US | 03 /
TAN, Jack, Saykiat 2125A Three Bridges Road Marshalltown, IA 50158 / US | [2007/44] | Representative(s) | Latham, Stuart Alexander, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/22] | Latham, Stuart Alexander, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [2007/44] | Wardle, Callum Tarn, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 06717291.6 | 03.01.2006 | [2007/44] | WO2006US00066 | Priority number, date | US20050906374 | 16.02.2005 Original published format: US 906374 | [2007/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006088563 | Date: | 24.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1848893 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1848893 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F15B5/00, F16K3/08 | [2007/44] | CPC: |
F15B5/00 (EP,BR,US);
F16K3/08 (BR);
F16K3/085 (EP,BR,US);
Y10T137/86734 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/44] | Title | German: | PNEUMATISCHE VORRICHTUNG MIT SELEKTIV WÄHLBARER ÖFFNUNG | [2007/44] | English: | PNEUMATIC DEVICE HAVING A SELECTIVELY VARIABLE ORIFICE | [2007/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF PNEUMATIQUE AYANT UN ORIFICE VARIABLE DE MANIERE SELECTIVE | [2007/44] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/44] | 08.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2008 | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.01.2006 | AT | 22.02.2012 | BE | 22.02.2012 | CY | 22.02.2012 | CZ | 22.02.2012 | DK | 22.02.2012 | EE | 22.02.2012 | FI | 22.02.2012 | IT | 22.02.2012 | LT | 22.02.2012 | LV | 22.02.2012 | NL | 22.02.2012 | PL | 22.02.2012 | RO | 22.02.2012 | SE | 22.02.2012 | SI | 22.02.2012 | SK | 22.02.2012 | TR | 22.02.2012 | BG | 22.05.2012 | GR | 23.05.2012 | ES | 02.06.2012 | IS | 22.06.2012 | PT | 22.06.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
BE | 22.02.2012 | ||
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
TR | 22.02.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
BE | 22.02.2012 | ||
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
BE | 22.02.2012 | ||
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
BE | 22.02.2012 | ||
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 22.02.2012 | |
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 22.02.2012 | |
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 22.02.2012 | |
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 22.02.2012 | |
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 22.02.2012 | |
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 22.02.2012 | |
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 22.02.2012 | |
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 22.02.2012 | |
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 22.02.2012 | |
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | LT | 22.02.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4643215 (PHLIPOT JAMES R [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-13,15,17,18,20,21 * column 3, line 11 - column 4, line 65; figures 1-4 *; | [X]DE19807503 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-6,9-11,13,15-18,21 * column 3, line 36 - column 5, line 2; figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE19821648 (SCHLUDI KLAUS [DE]) [X] 1,2,10-13,15,21 * page 2, lines 4-6 * * page 3, lines 27-42; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2003155017 (ROGALSKI MARKUS [DE], et al) [X] 1,10,14,21* paragraphs [0029] , [0045] - [0051]; figures 1,3,4 * |