EP1846143 - INTEGRATED ELECTRO-PRESSURE MEMBRANE DEIONIZATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EET Corporation 3106 Roane State Highway Harriman TN 37748 / US | [2007/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SFERRAZZA, Alois 10312 N. River Trail Knoxville, Tennessee 37922 / US | 02 /
SCHMIDT, Ernst 10725 Deep Woods Lane Knoxville, Tennessee 37922 / US | 03 /
WILLIAMS, Michael, E. Rr 5, Box 756 Albany, Kentucky 42602 / US | [2007/43] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/43] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06717445.8 | 05.01.2006 | [2007/43] | WO2006US00241 | Priority number, date | US20050030542 | 06.01.2005 Original published format: US 30542 | [2007/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006074259 | Date: | 13.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1846143 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.01.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B01D61/58 | [2010/04] | CPC: |
C02F1/44 (EP,US);
B01D61/025 (EP,US);
B01D61/423 (EP,US);
B01D61/44 (EP,US);
B01D61/58 (EP,US);
C02F1/469 (EP,US);
B01D61/027 (EP,US);
C02F1/441 (EP,US);
C02F1/442 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/43] | B01D61/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTES ELEKTRODRUCKMEMBRAN-ENTIONISIERUNGSSYSTEM | [2007/43] | English: | INTEGRATED ELECTRO-PRESSURE MEMBRANE DEIONIZATION SYSTEM | [2007/43] | French: | SYSTEME INTEGRE DE DESIONISATION A MEMBRANE COMMANDEE PAR PRESSION ELECTRIQUE | [2007/43] | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2007 | Search fee paid | 06.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/43] | 12.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/39] | 22.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JPH09276864 (TORAY ENG CO LTD); | [X]EP1075868 (KURITA WATER IND LTD [JP]); | [I]JP2001259376 (ORGANO KK); | [IA]WO2004013048 (UNIV SOUTH CAROLINA [US], et al); | [I]JP2004074109 (ORGANO KK) | International search | [X]US5057197 (PERRY MORDECHAI [IL], et al); | [Y]US6537436 (SCHMIDT ERNST [US], et al); | [YE]US7083730 (DAVIS THOMAS A [US]) |