EP1838867 - APOLIPOPROTEIN A-II ISOFORM AS A BIOMARKER FOR PROSTATE CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2012 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastern Virginia Medical School 825 Fairfax Avenue P.O.Box 1980 Norfolk, VA 23507 / US | [2010/36] |
Former [2007/40] | For all designated states Eastern Virginia Medical School 825 Fairfax Avenue, P.O. Box 1980 Norfolk, VA 23501-6006 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEMMES, John, O. 207 James River Drive Newport News, VA 23601 / US | 02 /
MALIK, Gunjan 16111 La Madera Rio Helotes, TX 78023 / US | 03 /
WARD, Michael, D. 1302 Equinox Landing Chesapeake, VA 23322 / US | [2007/52] |
Former [2007/40] | 01 /
SEMMES, John, O. 207 James River Drive Newport News, VA 23601 / US | ||
02 /
MALIK, Gunjan 417-B Oak Lake Way Chesapeake, VA 23320 / US | |||
03 /
WARD, Michael, D. 1302 Equinox Landing Chesapeake, VA 23322 / US | Representative(s) | Lee, Nicholas John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/40] | Lee, Nicholas John, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06717624.8 | 06.01.2006 | [2007/40] | WO2006US00450 | Priority number, date | US20050642332P | 06.01.2005 Original published format: US 642332 P | [2007/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006074360 | Date: | 13.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1838867 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1838867 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.01.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/00, G01N33/53 | [2007/40] | CPC: |
G01N33/57434 (EP,US);
G01N33/92 (EP,US);
G01N2333/775 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | APOLIPOPROTEIN-A-II-ISOFORM ALS BIOMARKER FÜR PROSTATAKREBS | [2007/40] | English: | APOLIPOPROTEIN A-II ISOFORM AS A BIOMARKER FOR PROSTATE CANCER | [2007/40] | French: | ISOFORME D'APOLIPOPROTEINE A-II UTILISEE EN TANT QUE BIOMARQUEUR POUR LE CANCER DE LA PROSTATE | [2007/40] | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2007 | Search fee paid | 06.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/40] | 05.09.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.01.2006 | AT | 09.03.2011 | BE | 09.03.2011 | CY | 09.03.2011 | CZ | 09.03.2011 | DK | 09.03.2011 | EE | 09.03.2011 | FI | 09.03.2011 | LT | 09.03.2011 | LV | 09.03.2011 | PL | 09.03.2011 | RO | 09.03.2011 | SI | 09.03.2011 | SK | 09.03.2011 | TR | 09.03.2011 | BG | 09.06.2011 | GR | 10.06.2011 | ES | 20.06.2011 | IS | 09.07.2011 | PT | 11.07.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
TR | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/39] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 09.03.2011 | |
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 09.03.2011 | |
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1300683 (INT REAGENTS CORP [JP]) [X] 17-20,24* the whole document * | International search | [A] - NIEDERKOFLER ET AL., "Novel Mass Spectrometric Immunoassays for the Rapid Structural Characterization of Plasma Apolipoproteins", J. LIPID RES., (200303), vol. 44, no. 3, pages 630 - 639, XP009013322 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1194/jlr.D200034-JLR200 | [XP] - MALIK ET AL., "Serum Levels of an Isoform of Apolipoprotein A-II as a Potential Marker for Prostate Cancer", CLIN. CANCER RES., (20050201), vol. 11, no. 3, pages 1073 - 1085, XP003005157 |