EP1848862 - CONTROL OF TOILET BOWL FILL FLOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.2013 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MJSI Inc. 612 Nicholson Street, Suite 115 Joliet, IL 60435 / US | [2007/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHUSTER, Michael, J. 612 Nicholson Street, Suite 115 Joliet, IL 60435 / US | 02 /
D'AURELIO, Michael, J. 2929 Perrington Court Marietta, GA 30066 / US | [2007/44] | Representative(s) | Powell, Stephen David Williams Powell 44 Prospect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/44] | Powell, Stephen David WILLIAMS POWELL Morley House 26-30 Holborn Viaduct London EC1A 2BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 06717913.5 | 11.01.2006 | [2007/44] | WO2006US00770 | Priority number, date | US20050050317 | 03.02.2005 Original published format: US 50317 | [2007/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006083501 | Date: | 10.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1848862 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | E03D1/00 | [2007/44] | CPC: |
E03D5/105 (EP,US);
E03D1/32 (EP,US);
E03D1/34 (US);
G01F23/56 (US);
G01F23/76 (US);
G01L19/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNG DES FÜLLFLUSSES IN EINER TOILETTENSCHÜSSEL | [2007/44] | English: | CONTROL OF TOILET BOWL FILL FLOW | [2007/44] | French: | REGULATION DU DEBIT DE REMPLISSAGE D'UNE CUVETTE DE W-C. | [2007/44] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2007 | Search fee paid | 03.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/44] | 18.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 27.05.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 31.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/03] | 12.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YE]US7047574 ; | [Y]US5133089 ; | [Y]US2004168247 |