EP1842298 - SATELLITE/TERRESTRIAL WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS AND METHODS USING DISPARATE CHANNEL SEPARATION CODES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ATC Technologies, LLC 10802 Parkridge Boulevard Reston, VA 20191- 5416 / US | [2007/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARABINIS, Peter, D. PO BOX 190 Cary, North Carolina 27512 / US | [2007/41] | Representative(s) | Naismith, Robert Stewart, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [2017/19] |
Former [2008/33] | Naismith, Robert Stewart, et al Marks & Clerk Scotland 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow, G1 3AE Scotland / GB | ||
Former [2007/41] | Naismith, Robert Stewart, et al Marks & Clerk 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow, G1 3AE Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 06717929.1 | 11.01.2006 | [2007/41] | WO2006US00791 | Priority number, date | US20050044477 | 27.01.2005 Original published format: US 44477 | [2007/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006081067 | Date: | 03.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1842298 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1842298 | Date: | 10.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/185 | [2007/41] | CPC: |
H04B7/18563 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/19] |
Former [2007/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSE SATELLITEN-/TERRESTRISCHES KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN MIT UNGLEICHEN KANALTRENNUNGSCODES | [2007/41] | English: | SATELLITE/TERRESTRIAL WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS AND METHODS USING DISPARATE CHANNEL SEPARATION CODES | [2007/41] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL TERRESTRES/PAR SATELLITE UTILISANT DES CODES DE SÉPARATION DE CANAUX DISPARATES | [2016/47] |
Former [2007/41] | SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES DE COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL TERRESTRES/PAR SATELLITE UTILISANT DES CODES DE SEPARATION DE CANAUX DISPARATES | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/41] | 28.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.05.2010 | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.01.2006 | AT | 10.05.2017 | CY | 10.05.2017 | CZ | 10.05.2017 | DK | 10.05.2017 | EE | 10.05.2017 | ES | 10.05.2017 | IT | 10.05.2017 | LT | 10.05.2017 | LV | 10.05.2017 | MC | 10.05.2017 | NL | 10.05.2017 | PL | 10.05.2017 | PT | 10.05.2017 | RO | 10.05.2017 | SI | 10.05.2017 | SK | 10.05.2017 | TR | 10.05.2017 | BG | 10.08.2017 | GR | 11.08.2017 | IS | 10.09.2017 | IE | 11.01.2018 | LU | 11.01.2018 | BE | 31.01.2018 | CH | 31.01.2018 | FR | 31.01.2018 | LI | 31.01.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 11.01.2006 | |
AT | 10.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PT | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
TR | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
IE | 11.01.2018 | ||
LU | 11.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
TR | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
IE | 11.01.2018 | ||
LU | 11.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
IE | 11.01.2018 | ||
LU | 11.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
IE | 11.01.2018 | ||
LU | 11.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
LU | 11.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
LU | 11.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
LU | 11.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2002090942 (KARABINIS PETER D [US], et al) [X] 1-66 * paragraphs [0027] , [0028] , [0031] , [0044] , [0060] , [0178] , [0179] , [0306] - [0217]; figures 6b,6g,6g *; | [A]US6198730 (HOGBERG SHAWN WESLEY [US], et al) [A] 1-66 * column 2, line 14 - line 40 * * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 12 *; | [A]EP1231723 (ICO SERVICES LTD [GB]) [A] 1-66 * column 10, line 45 - column 13, line 27; figures 9,10 *; | [A]US2004203393 (CHEN XIANG [US]) [A] 1-66 * figures 1,4 *; | [A]US6052560 (KARABINIS PETER D [US]) [A] 1-66 * column 3, line 9 - line 65 * * column 5, line 4 - line 63 * | Examination | US2003054762 |