EP1846425 - PROCESSES FOR THE PRODUCTION OF ORGANOMETALLIC COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRAXAIR TECHNOLOGY, INC. 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury, CT 06810-5113 / US | [2007/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETERS, David, Walter 284 Skyview Drive Kingsland, Texas 78639 / US | 02 /
MOSSCROP, Michael, Thomas, III 22 Woodette Place Buffalo, New York 14207 / US | [2007/48] |
Former [2007/43] | 01 /
PETERS, David, Walter 4226 Tonawanda Creek Road North Tonawanda, New York 14120 / US | ||
02 /
MOSSCROP, Michael, Thomas, III 22 Woodette Place Buffalo, New York 14207 / US | Representative(s) | Schwan Schorer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Bauerstraße 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/35] | Schwan - Schwan - Schorer Patentanwälte European Patent Attorneys Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/43] | Schwan - Schwan - Schorer Patentanwälte European Patent Attorneys Bauerstrasse 22 D-80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06718233.7 | 17.01.2006 | [2007/43] | WO2006US01138 | Priority number, date | US20050036027 | 18.01.2005 Original published format: US 36027 | [2007/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006078542 | Date: | 27.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1846425 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1846425 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.07.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07F5/06, B05D5/12, C23C16/00 | [2007/43] | CPC: |
C07F5/069 (EP,US);
C23C16/00 (KR);
C07F5/06 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB [2008/17] |
Former [2007/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG METALLORGANISCHER VERBINDUNGEN | [2007/43] | English: | PROCESSES FOR THE PRODUCTION OF ORGANOMETALLIC COMPOUNDS | [2007/43] | French: | PROCEDES DE PRODUCTION DE COMPOSES ORGANOMETALLIQUES | [2007/43] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2007 | Search fee paid | 10.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/43] | 27.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - SCHMIDT, D.L. ET AL., "Aluminum trihydride-diethyl etherate", INORGANIC SYNTHESES, (1973), pages 47 - 52, XP002597846 [X] 1-4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/9780470132456.ch10 | International search | [A]US4748260 (MARLETT EVERETT M [US]); | [A]US5113025 (PARK WON S [US], et al); | [Y]US6143357 (SHIN HYUN-KOOCK [KR], et al) | Examination | WO2004034527 |