EP1977095 - CONTROLLING TEMPERATURE OF EXHAUST AND INTAKE GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.2015 [2015/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MACK TRUCKS, INC. 2100 Mack Blvd., P.O. Box M Allentown, PA 18105-5000 / US | [2008/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STABLEIN, Mark 11026 Eastwood Drive Haegerstown, MD 21742 / US | 02 /
RADERMACHER, Axel J. 7907 River Run Ct. Frederick, MD 21701 / US | [2009/09] |
Former [2008/45] | 01 /
STABLEIN, Mark 5710 Trailview Court Frederick, MD 21742 / US | ||
02 /
RADERMACHER, Axel J. 7907 River Run Ct. Frederick, MD 21701 / US | |||
Former [2008/41] | 01 /
STABLEIN, Mark 5710 Trailview Court 21742 Frederick / US | ||
02 /
RADERMACHER, Axel J. 7907 River Run Ct. Frederick, MD 21701 / US | Representative(s) | Fröhling, Werner Otto Volvo Technology Corporation Corporate Patents 06820, M1.7 405 08 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Fröhling, Werner Otto Volvo Technology Corporation Corporate Patents 06820, M1.7 405 08 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 06718318.6 | 13.01.2006 | [2008/41] | WO2006US01231 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007081342 | Date: | 19.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1977095 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.07.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F02B33/44, F01N3/00, F01N5/04, F01N5/00, G05D23/10, // F02M25/07, F02B29/04 | [2014/30] | CPC: |
F02B37/16 (EP,US);
F01N3/025 (EP,US);
F01N3/027 (EP,US);
F01N3/028 (EP,US);
F01N3/103 (EP,US);
F01N3/2006 (EP,US);
F01N5/02 (EP,US);
F02B33/443 (EP,US);
F02B37/22 (EP,US);
F02D41/025 (EP,US);
F02M26/05 (EP,US);
F02M31/042 (EP,US);
F02M31/08 (EP,US);
F02M31/083 (EP,US);
G05D23/19 (EP,US);
F01N2240/36 (EP,US);
F01N2570/14 (EP,US);
F01N3/2013 (EP,US);
F01N3/202 (EP,US);
F01N3/2033 (EP,US);
F02B29/0418 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/41] | F02B33/44, F01N3/00, F01N5/04, F01N5/00, G05D23/10, F02M25/07 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/41] | Title | German: | STEUERUNG DER TEMPERATUR VON ABGAS UND EINLASSGAS | [2008/41] | English: | CONTROLLING TEMPERATURE OF EXHAUST AND INTAKE GAS | [2008/41] | French: | MÉTHODE DE COMMANDE DE TEMPÉRATURE D'UN GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT ET D'UN GAZ D'AMENÉE | [2008/41] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2008 | Search fee paid | 13.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/19] | 07.08.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/41] | 22.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2015 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US4215550 (DINGER HANS [DE], et al) [Y] 25,26 * abstract * * column 5, line 39 - column 7, line l * [A] 1-23,27-50; | [XA]DE4311904 (AUDI AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,6,10,35,36,39-43,50 * abstract * * column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 35 * [A] 5,7-9,11-34,37,38,44-49; | [XA]EP1365125 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [X] 1-13,35,36,39-44,50 * abstract * * paragraphs [0020] - [0035] * [A] 14-34,37,38,45-49; | [XAYI]US6675579 (YANG JIALIN [US]) [X] 1-4,6,10,13-15,19,21-24,27,32,33,35-50 * abstract * * column 5, line 64 - column 6, line 42 * [A] 5,7-9,11,12,28-31 [Y] 25,26 [I] 16-18,20,34; | [XA]US6722128 (ADRIAN JOHN [AU]) [X] 1-4,29,30,35,41,50 * abstract * * paragraph [0049] * [A] 5-28,31-34,36-40,42-49; | [XA]US2005022526 (SCHEINERT HELMUT [DE]) [X] 1-5,21,22,28,31,35-50 * abstract * * paragraphs [0022] - [0026] * [A] 6-20,23-27,29,30,32-34; | [E]WO2006050904 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE], et al) [E] 1-13,27,28,32,33,35-50 * figure - ** paragraphs [0026] - [0036] * | International search | [Y]US4719751 (KUME SATORU [JP], et al); | [Y]US5180559 (MA THOMAS T [GB]); | [Y]US6363721 (PRENNINGER PETER [AT], et al); | [Y]US6431458 (CESSAC KEVIN [US]); | [Y]US2003010022 (SUZUKI MAKOTO [JP]); | [X]US6675579 (YANG JIALIN [US]); | [Y]US2004128985 (SHIMASAKI YUICHI [JP], et al); | [Y]US2004187483 (DALLA BETTA RALPH A [US], et al); | [Y]US2005022526 (SCHEINERT HELMUT [DE]) |