EP1850691 - PERSONAL HYDRATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.02.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.03.2010 [2010/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fiskars Brands, Inc. 2537 Daniels Street Madison, WI 53718 / US | [2007/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARL, Frederick, T. 23130 South Bland Circle West Linn, OR 97068 / US | 02 /
KARL, Brie, G. 23130 South Bland Circle West Linn, OR 97068 / US | 03 /
DIETER, William, M. 2506 Ne 17th Avenue Portland, OR 97212 / US | [2007/45] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/45] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 06718364.0 | 12.01.2006 | [2007/45] | WO2006US01278 | Priority number, date | US20050044989 | 27.01.2005 Original published format: US 44989 | [2007/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006081081 | Date: | 03.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1850691 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A45F3/16, B65D77/28, B67D3/00 | [2007/45] | CPC: |
A45F3/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR PERSÖNLICHEN FLÜSSIGKEITSZUFUHR | [2007/45] | English: | PERSONAL HYDRATION SYSTEM | [2007/45] | French: | SYSTEME D'HYDRATATION PERSONNEL | [2007/45] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/45] | 28.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/13] | 11.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US4982854 (ICHIMIYA TUYOSHI [JP]) [X] 1,2,5-8 * column 2, line 52 - column 4, line 29 * [Y] 1; | [X]US5005717 (OILAR CLAYTON D [US]) [X] 1,2,5,7 * column 3, line 27 - column 4, line 65 *; | [X]US4573631 (REEVES MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1,2,5,7,8 * column 4, line 14 - column 6, line 47 *; | [Y]US2808965 (GRAPHIA III ANTHONY J, et al) [Y] 1-8 * column 2, line 20 - column 4, line 75 *; | [Y]US5645404 (ZELENAK JOHN M [US]) [Y] 1,2,4-8 * column 3, line 62 - column 11, line 33 *; | [Y]US2002043513 (LIPSON ERIK [US]) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0046] - [0078] *; | [Y]WO2004100708 (FISKARS BRANDS INC [US], et al) [Y] 2,4-6,8 * paragraphs [0039] - [0072] * | Examination | US2002148806 |