EP1836808 - FIBRE CHANNEL FORWARDING INFORMATION BASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. 170 West Tasman Drive San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2007/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AGRAWAL, Pawan 3141 Promontory Way San Jose, California 95135 / US | 02 /
SUNDARARAMAN, Sujatha 2296 Cascade Street Milpitas, California 95035 / US | 03 /
KLOTH, Raymond J. 12649 Arroyo De Arguello Saratoga, California 95070 / US | 04 /
GOEL, Deepak 39877 Sundale Drive, 120 Fremont, California 94538 / US | 05 /
GARG, Nitin 508 Issac Court San Jose, California 95136 / US | 06 /
JAIN, Sachin 310 Elan Village Lane, 132 San Jose, California 95134 / US | [2007/39] | Representative(s) | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/47] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | ||
Former [2007/39] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06718453.1 | 12.01.2006 | [2007/39] | WO2006US01380 | Priority number, date | US20050035158 | 12.01.2005 Original published format: US 35158 | [2007/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006076662 | Date: | 20.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1836808 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1836808 | Date: | 22.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.05.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/741, H04L12/707, H04L12/715, H04L12/701 | [2017/28] | CPC: |
H04L45/00 (EP,US);
H04L45/04 (EP,US);
H04L45/22 (US);
H04L45/54 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/03] | H04L12/28, H04L12/56 | ||
Former IPC [2007/39] | H04L12/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/47] |
Former [2007/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSBASIS ZUR FASERKANALWEITERLEITUNG | [2007/39] | English: | FIBRE CHANNEL FORWARDING INFORMATION BASE | [2007/39] | French: | BASE D'INFORMATION RELATIVE A L'ACHEMINEMENT DE TYPE FIBRE CHANNEL | [2007/39] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2007 | Search fee paid | 29.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/39] | 18.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.01.2006 | AT | 22.11.2017 | CY | 22.11.2017 | CZ | 22.11.2017 | DK | 22.11.2017 | EE | 22.11.2017 | ES | 22.11.2017 | FI | 22.11.2017 | IT | 22.11.2017 | LT | 22.11.2017 | LV | 22.11.2017 | MC | 22.11.2017 | NL | 22.11.2017 | PL | 22.11.2017 | PT | 22.11.2017 | RO | 22.11.2017 | SE | 22.11.2017 | SI | 22.11.2017 | SK | 22.11.2017 | TR | 22.11.2017 | IE | 12.01.2018 | LU | 12.01.2018 | BE | 31.01.2018 | CH | 31.01.2018 | LI | 31.01.2018 | BG | 22.02.2018 | GR | 23.02.2018 | IS | 22.03.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 12.01.2006 | |
AT | 22.11.2017 | ||
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PT | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
TR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IE | 12.01.2018 | ||
LU | 12.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
TR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IE | 12.01.2018 | ||
LU | 12.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
IE | 12.01.2018 | ||
LU | 12.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
IE | 12.01.2018 | ||
LU | 12.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
LU | 12.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
LU | 12.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
LU | 12.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
LU | 12.01.2018 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/41] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 22.11.2017 | |
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003084219 (YAO HAWKINS [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0064] ** figures 1-18 * | International search | [A]US6185203 (BERMAN STUART B [US]) | by applicant | US2003084219 |