EP1851540 - TEST SENSOR CARTRIDGES AND SENSOR-DISPENSING INSTRUMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer HealthCare, LLC 555 White Plains Road Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | [2007/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REYNOLDS, Jeffery, S. 13, Bigelow Road New Fairfield, CT 06812 / US | 02 /
CREAVEN, John, P. 50552 Sharpe Bridge Drive Granger, IN 46530 / US | 03 /
ZUIDEMA, Jack, L. 53713 County Road 11 North Elkhart, IN 46514 / US | [2007/45] | Representative(s) | Burkert, Frank Bayer Schering Pharma Aktiengesellschaft Law and Patents Patents and Licensing Building Q 18 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | Burkert, Frank Bayer Schering Pharma Aktiengesellschaft Law and Patents Patents and Licensing Building Q 18 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2009/37] | Burkert, Frank Bayer Schering Pharma Aktiengesellschaft Law and Patents Patents and Licensing Building Q 18 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2007/45] | Burkert, Frank Bayer HealthCare AG LP-PL, Q18 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 06718661.9 | 13.01.2006 | [2007/45] | WO2006US01617 | Priority number, date | US20050643801P | 14.01.2005 Original published format: US 643801 P | US20050684129P | 24.05.2005 Original published format: US 684129 P | [2007/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006076721 | Date: | 20.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1851540 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1851540 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/487 | [2007/45] | CPC: |
G01N33/48757 (EP,US);
A61B5/14532 (EP,US);
A61B5/150022 (EP,US);
A61B5/150305 (EP,US);
A61B5/150358 (EP,US);
A61B5/150755 (EP,US);
A61B5/15146 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/45] | Title | German: | TESTSENSORKASSETTEN UND SENSORABGABEGERÄTE | [2007/45] | English: | TEST SENSOR CARTRIDGES AND SENSOR-DISPENSING INSTRUMENTS | [2007/45] | French: | CARTOUCHES A CAPTEURS TEST ET INSTRUMENTS POUR DISTRIBUER LES CAPTEURS | [2007/45] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/45] | 26.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11190667.3 / EP2426493 | EP11190668.1 / EP2426494 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.01.2006 | AT | 15.08.2012 | BE | 15.08.2012 | CY | 15.08.2012 | CZ | 15.08.2012 | DK | 15.08.2012 | EE | 15.08.2012 | FI | 15.08.2012 | IT | 15.08.2012 | LT | 15.08.2012 | LV | 15.08.2012 | NL | 15.08.2012 | PL | 15.08.2012 | RO | 15.08.2012 | SI | 15.08.2012 | SK | 15.08.2012 | TR | 15.08.2012 | BG | 15.11.2012 | GR | 16.11.2012 | ES | 26.11.2012 | IS | 15.12.2012 | PT | 17.12.2012 | IE | 13.01.2013 | LU | 13.01.2013 | CH | 31.01.2013 | LI | 31.01.2013 | MC | 31.01.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
TR | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
IE | 13.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
IE | 13.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/46] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 15.08.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002104849 (GIRUAD JEAN-PIERRE [FR]) [A] 1-38 * paragraphs [0031] - [0036]; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]EP1321769 (LIFESCAN INC [US]) [Y] 1-38 * paragraphs [0007] - [0014] - [0017] , [0021] , [0023]; figures 1,2b,7,8 *; | [Y]EP1329395 (LIFESCAN INC [US]) [Y] 1-38 * paragraphs [0071] , [0087] - [0089] - [0098]; figure 7 *; | [A]EP1352611 (INVERNESS MEDICAL LTD [GB]) [A] 1-38 * paragraphs [0008] - [0023] - [0059] , [0061]; figures 2,3 *; | [A]WO2004063747 (HYPOGUARD LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-38* page 11, line 27 - page 13, line 10; figures 1-5 * |