EP1855622 - FABRICATION METHOD OF AN OCULAR PROSTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/47] | OCULAR PROSTHESIS AND FABRICATION METHOD OF SAME | ||
[2020/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2021 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.05.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Friel, Timothy P. 4833 Ruby Avenue, Fourth Floor Bethesda, MD 20814 / US | [2007/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/47] | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès Immeuble le Palatin 2 3 Cours du Triangle CS 80165 92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [2020/42] |
Former [2007/47] | Corret, Hélène, et al Cabinet Orès 36, rue de St Pétersbourg F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 06719986.9 | 01.02.2006 | [2007/47] | WO2006US03414 | Priority number, date | US20050649020P | 01.02.2005 Original published format: US 649020 P | [2007/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006083875 | Date: | 10.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1855622 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1855622 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.09.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/14 | [2014/15] | CPC: |
A61F2/141 (EP,US);
B29C64/112 (EP,US);
B29C64/153 (EP,US);
B29D11/02 (EP);
B33Y10/00 (EP,US);
B33Y50/00 (EP,US);
B33Y80/00 (EP,US);
A61F2/0059 (EP,US);
A61F2240/002 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0063 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0827 (EP,US);
B29C65/1406 (EP,US);
B29C65/48 (EP,US);
B29C65/4845 (EP,US);
B29C66/5412 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/47] | A61F2/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/42] |
Former [2007/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR AUGENPROTHESE | [2020/04] | English: | FABRICATION METHOD OF AN OCULAR PROSTHESIS | [2020/04] | French: | PROCEDE DE REALISATION D'UNE PROTHESE OCULAIRE | [2020/25] |
Former [2007/47] | AUGENPROTHESE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2007/47] | OCULAR PROSTHESIS AND FABRICATION METHOD OF SAME | ||
Former [2007/47] | PROTHESE OCULAIRE ET PROCEDE DE REALISATION ASSOCIE | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2007 | Search fee paid | 31.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/47] | 07.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.07.2018 | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.02.2006 | AT | 14.10.2020 | CY | 14.10.2020 | CZ | 14.10.2020 | DK | 14.10.2020 | EE | 14.10.2020 | ES | 14.10.2020 | FI | 14.10.2020 | IT | 14.10.2020 | LT | 14.10.2020 | LV | 14.10.2020 | MC | 14.10.2020 | NL | 14.10.2020 | PL | 14.10.2020 | RO | 14.10.2020 | SE | 14.10.2020 | SI | 14.10.2020 | SK | 14.10.2020 | TR | 14.10.2020 | BG | 14.01.2021 | GR | 15.01.2021 | LU | 01.02.2021 | IS | 14.02.2021 | PT | 15.02.2021 | BE | 28.02.2021 | CH | 28.02.2021 | FR | 28.02.2021 | LI | 28.02.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2023/27] | HU | 01.02.2006 | |
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CY | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
LU | 01.02.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
CY | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
LU | 01.02.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
LU | 01.02.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
LU | 01.02.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
LU | 01.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
LU | 01.02.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
LU | 01.02.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
LU | 01.02.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
LU | 01.02.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/41] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PL | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 14.10.2020 | |
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 14.10.2020 | |
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 14.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]GB1327056 (STOVER M) [Y] 15-17,37 * page 1, lines 9-50 * * page 2, line 25 - page 3, line 3; figure 2; claim 4 *[A] 2,5,14,20; | [YA]AU584704B (TAYLOR & TREFRY PTY LTD) [Y] 2,14,18,19,21-25,33-35 * page 4, line 5 - page 6, line 5 * * page 7, lines 3-13; claims 1,4-6 * [A] 1,3,4,12,13,20; | [XY]US5026392 (GORDON GREGG E [US]) [X] 1,5,6 * column 1, lines 5-11 * * column 2, lines 22-54 * * column 3, line 25 - column 4, line 21; figures 1,3; claims 2-4,6,9,10 * [Y] 2-4,12-14; | [Y]WO9507509 (UNIV QUEENSLAND [AU], et al) [Y] 18,19,21-25,34-36,38-40,49,50 * page 1, lines 5-24 * * page 7, line 1334; figure 1; claims 1,5,8,10,12,13 *; | [YA]US5733333 (SANKEY GREGORY [US]) [Y] 6,10,11,51 * the whole document * [A] 5,8,9; | [Y]US6143026 (MEAKEM THOMAS J [US]) [Y] 36-40,48-53 * column 1, lines 4-6 * * page 2, lines 20-47 * * column 3, line 16 - column 4, line 10; figure -; claim 1 *; | [XYI]US6669727 (YOUNG STEVEN R [US]) [X] 5,7 * column 2, lines 30-32 * * column 2, lines 54-55 * * column 3, lines 13-15; figure 6; claims 1,5-8 * [Y] 6,10-17,52,53 [I] 8,9; | [Y]WO2004007012 (EDWARDS LIFESCIENCES CORP [US]) [Y] 3,4,12,13,33,48 * claim 27 * | International search | [X]US5326346 (CORTES AQUILEO L [US]); | [Y]US5742172 (YASUTAKE MASATOSHI [JP]); | [Y]US6576013 (BUDMAN MARK [US], et al); | [Y]US2004005374 (NARANG SUBHASH [US], et al); | [Y]US2004113301 (BURGER GORAN [DE], et al); | [Y]US2004247428 (GOTTA ROMINA SILVIA [IT], et al); | [Y]US2004265770 (CHAPOULAUD ERIC [US], et al); | [Y]US2005010450 (HULTGREN BRUCE WILLARD [US], et al) | by applicant | US4332039 | AU584704B | US5026392 | US5061279 | US5171265 | US5326346 | US6143026 | US6391057 | US6427087 | US6530953 | US6669727 | - ALLEN, L.; BULGARELLI, D. M., "Obtaining and understanding the alginate impression", THE JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF OCULARISTS, (1988), vol. 19, pages 4 - 13 |