EP1844586 - COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR EMERGENCY SERVICES PERSONNEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/42] | DUAL-MESH NETWORK AND COMMUNICATION SYSTEM FOR EMERGENCY SERVICES PERSONNEL | ||
[2010/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2011 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scott Technologies, Inc. One Town Center Road Boca Raton FL 33486 / US | [2007/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARKULO, Craig, Michael 5092 Sable Ct. Concord, NC 28025 / US | [2007/42] | Representative(s) | Hedges, Martin Nicholas, et al AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/49] | Hedges, Martin Nicholas, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | ||
Former [2010/03] | Perkins, Sarah, et al Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1, Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BG / GB | ||
Former [2007/42] | Perkins, Sarah, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins Halton House 20/23 Holborn London EC1N 2JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06720041.0 | 31.01.2006 | [2007/42] | WO2006US03497 | Priority number, date | US20050648595P | 31.01.2005 Original published format: US 648595 P | [2007/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006083931 | Date: | 10.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1844586 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1844586 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/22 | [2010/09] | CPC: |
H04W4/90 (EP);
H04W4/029 (EP,US);
H04W76/50 (EP);
H04W4/02 (EP);
H04W4/06 (EP);
H04W84/18 (EP);
H04W88/06 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/42] | H04L12/56, H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR NOTDIENSTPERSONAL | [2010/09] | English: | COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR EMERGENCY SERVICES PERSONNEL | [2010/09] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATIONS ET PROCEDE POUR PERSONNEL DE SERVICES D'URGENCE | [2010/09] |
Former [2007/42] | DUALES MASCHENNETZWERK UND KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM FÜR NOTDIENSTPERSONAL | ||
Former [2007/42] | DUAL-MESH NETWORK AND COMMUNICATION SYSTEM FOR EMERGENCY SERVICES PERSONNEL | ||
Former [2007/42] | RESEAU MAILLE DOUBLE ET SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATIONS POUR PERSONNEL DE SERVICES D'URGENCE | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/42] | 12.10.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/28] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.12.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 22.12.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.08.2010 | BE | 04.08.2010 | CY | 04.08.2010 | CZ | 04.08.2010 | DK | 04.08.2010 | EE | 04.08.2010 | HU | 04.08.2010 | LT | 04.08.2010 | LV | 04.08.2010 | NL | 04.08.2010 | PL | 04.08.2010 | RO | 04.08.2010 | SE | 04.08.2010 | SI | 04.08.2010 | SK | 04.08.2010 | TR | 04.08.2010 | BG | 04.11.2010 | GR | 05.11.2010 | ES | 15.11.2010 | IS | 04.12.2010 | PT | 06.12.2010 | CH | 31.01.2011 | IE | 31.01.2011 | LI | 31.01.2011 | LU | 31.01.2011 | MC | 31.01.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
BE | 04.08.2010 | ||
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LV | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
TR | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
ES | 15.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
IE | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
LU | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
BE | 04.08.2010 | ||
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LV | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
ES | 15.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
IE | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
LU | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
BE | 04.08.2010 | ||
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LV | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
ES | 15.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
IE | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
BE | 04.08.2010 | ||
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LV | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
ES | 15.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/42] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
BE | 04.08.2010 | ||
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LV | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
ES | 15.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
BE | 04.08.2010 | ||
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LV | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
ES | 15.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
BE | 04.08.2010 | ||
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LV | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
BE | 04.08.2010 | ||
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LV | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
BE | 04.08.2010 | ||
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LV | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002081970 (WINGREN GUSTAV [SE]) [A] 1-22 * abstract ** figures 1,2 *; | [XA]WO03050689 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1-4,7,8,10,11 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * * page 4, line 3 - line 23 * * page 8, line 5 - page 9, line 31 * [A] 5,6,9,12-22; | [XA]EP1379026 (SONY INT EUROPE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,7,8,10,11 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0060] * [A] 5,6,9,12-22; | [XA]US2005001720 (MASON CHARLES [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * figures 1,2,6,9,10,12,13 * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0078] * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0086] * * claims 1-11 * [A] 13-22 |