EP1858532 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR LESS IMMUNOGENIC PROTEIN FORMULATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.04.2012 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.05.2012 [2012/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE RESEARCH FOUNDATION OF STATE UNIVERSITY OF NEW YORK STOR Intellectual Property Division, UB Technology Incubator, Suite 111, 1576 Sweet Home Road Amherst, NY 14228-2567 / US | [2007/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALASUBRAMANIAN, Sathyamagalam 947 Robin Road Amherst, New York 14228 / US | 02 /
STRAUBINGER, Robert, M. 109 Burroughs Drive Amherst, New York 14226 / US | 03 /
RAMANI, Karthik Flat B4, 149 East Crust Apts. LB Road, Thiruvamyur Chennai-600041 / IN | 04 /
PUROHIT, Vivek, S. 5802 Leyden Lane Huber Heights, Ohio 45424 / CA | [2008/30] |
Former [2007/48] | 01 /
BALASUBRAMANIAN, Sathyamagalam 947 Robin Road Amherst, New York 14228 / US | ||
02 /
STRAUBINGER, Robert, M. 109 Burroughs Drive Amherst, New York 14226 / US | |||
03 /
RAMANI, Karthik 311 Sunridge Drive Amherst, New York 14228 / US | |||
04 /
PUROHIT, Vivek, S. 323 Niagara Boulevard, Apt. 308 Fort Erie, Ontario, L2A 3H1 / CA | Representative(s) | Duckett, Anthony Joseph, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/42] | Duckett, Anthony Joseph, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2009/17] | Duckett, Anthony Joseph, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2007/48] | Naylor, Kathryn May, et al Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06720199.6 | 02.02.2006 | [2007/48] | WO2006US03779 | Priority number, date | US20050049134 | 02.02.2005 Original published format: US 49134 | [2007/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006084095 | Date: | 10.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1858532 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.08.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/14 | [2007/48] | CPC: |
A61K9/1075 (EP,US);
A61K38/37 (EP,US);
A61K9/127 (EP,US);
A61K9/1274 (EP,US);
A61P7/04 (EP);
C07K14/21 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN FÜR WENIGER IMMUNOGENE PROTEIN-FORMULIERUNGEN | [2007/48] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR LESS IMMUNOGENIC PROTEIN FORMULATIONS | [2007/48] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET METHODES D'OBTENTION DE PREPARATIONS MOINS IMMUNOGENES | [2007/48] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2007 | Search fee paid | 31.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/48] | 15.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/19] | 20.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2004071420 (UNIV NEW YORK STATE RES FOUND [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * page 5, line 16; claims 1, 3, 5 *; | [T] - PUROHIT VIVEK S ET AL, "Interaction of dicaproyl phosphatidylserine with recombinant factor VIII and its impact on immunogenicity.", THE AAPS JOURNAL 2006 LNKD- PUBMED:16796387, (2006), vol. 8, no. 2, ISSN 1550-7416, pages E362 - E370, XP002630658 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1208/aapsj080241 | International search | [Y]WO9955036 (NET INSIGHT AB [SE], et al); | [Y]US2002132982 (BALASUBRAMANIAN SATHYAMANGALAM [US], et al); | [A] - LENTING P.J., "The light chain of factor VIII comprises a binding site for low density lipoprotein receptor-related protein", J. BIOL. CHEM., (199908), vol. 274, no. 34, pages 23734 - 23739, XP000882874 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.274.34.23734 |