EP1851631 - DYNAMICALLY MEASURING AND RE-CLASSIFYING ACCESS POINTS IN A WIRELESS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. Mail Stop SJC 10/21 170 W. Tasman Drive San Jose, California 95134 / US | [2019/23] |
Former [2007/45] | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. 170 West Tasman Drive, M/S SJC 10/2/1 San Jose, CA 95134-1706 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STIEGLITZ, Jeremy 1066 Laurel Street Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 02 /
OLSON, Timothy, S. 5010 Tisdale Way San Jose, CA 95130 / US | 03 /
ROSHAN, Pejman, D. 1250 S Night Star Way Anaheim, CA 92808 / US | [2007/45] | Representative(s) | Noble, Nicholas, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2019/43] |
Former [2007/45] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06720429.7 | 06.02.2006 | [2007/45] | WO2006US04260 | Priority number, date | US20050066009 | 25.02.2005 Original published format: US 66009 | US20050188564 | 25.07.2005 Original published format: US 188564 | [2007/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006093634 | Date: | 08.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1851631 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1851631 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.09.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/00, H04L29/06, H04W12/12, H04W24/00, // H04W84/12, H04W88/08 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
H04W24/00 (EP,US);
H04L63/1433 (EP);
H04W12/122 (EP,US);
H04L63/20 (EP);
H04W84/12 (EP);
H04W88/08 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/45] | G06F11/00, H04Q7/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/43] |
Former [2007/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHE MESSUNG UND NEUKLASSIFIZIERUNG VON ZUGANGSPUNKTEN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN NETZWERK | [2007/45] | English: | DYNAMICALLY MEASURING AND RE-CLASSIFYING ACCESS POINTS IN A WIRELESS NETWORK | [2007/45] | French: | MESURE DYNAMIQUE ET RECLASSIFICATION DES POINTS D'ACCES DANS UN RESEAU SANS FIL | [2007/45] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2007 | Search fee paid | 13.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/45] | 09.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.03.2019 | 13.03.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 15.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.04.2017 | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.02.2006 | AT | 23.10.2019 | CY | 23.10.2019 | CZ | 23.10.2019 | DK | 23.10.2019 | EE | 23.10.2019 | ES | 23.10.2019 | FI | 23.10.2019 | IT | 23.10.2019 | LT | 23.10.2019 | LV | 23.10.2019 | MC | 23.10.2019 | NL | 23.10.2019 | PL | 23.10.2019 | RO | 23.10.2019 | SE | 23.10.2019 | SI | 23.10.2019 | SK | 23.10.2019 | TR | 23.10.2019 | BG | 23.01.2020 | GR | 24.01.2020 | IE | 06.02.2020 | LU | 06.02.2020 | IS | 23.02.2020 | PT | 24.02.2020 | BE | 29.02.2020 | CH | 29.02.2020 | LI | 29.02.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2022/26] | AT | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
TR | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IE | 06.02.2020 | ||
LU | 06.02.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AT | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IE | 06.02.2020 | ||
LU | 06.02.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AT | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IE | 06.02.2020 | ||
LU | 06.02.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AT | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
LU | 06.02.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AT | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
LU | 06.02.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | CZ | 23.10.2019 | |
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
LU | 06.02.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | CZ | 23.10.2019 | |
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 23.10.2019 | |
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 23.10.2019 | |
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | CZ | 23.10.2019 | |
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | ES | 23.10.2019 | |
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | ES | 23.10.2019 | |
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | NL | 23.10.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003117985 (FUJII KAZUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * figures 1-7 * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0046] *; | [A]US2003186679 (CHALLENER DAVID CARROLL [US], et al) [A] 1-17* the whole document *; | [A]US2004023640 (BALLAI PHILIP N [US]) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0025] *; | [XI]WO2005018162 (CISCO TECH IND [US], et al) [X] 1-10,13-15 * abstract * * figures 1,7 * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0079] * * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0096] * * claims 1-13 * [I] 11,12,16,17 | International search | [A]US2003219129 (WHELAN ROBERT [US], et al); | [A]US2004042410 (HARRIS JOHN M [US], et al); | [A]US2004120260 (BERNIER MARK [US], et al) | by applicant | US2005171720 | US6990428 | US2006200862 | US7181530 | US7302269 |