EP1848559 - SELF-CENTERING DRILL BIT CHUCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Black & Decker Inc. 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | [2007/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIBBONS, Louis, A. 917 Chesapeake Drive Stevensville, MD 21666 / US | 02 /
CAMPBELL, David, C. 503 Barwick Court Bel Air, MD 21014 / US | [2007/44] | Representative(s) | SBD IPAdmin 270 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 4DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/44] | SBD IPAdmin 210 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | ||
Former [2008/34] | Shaya, Darrin Maurice Black & Decker Europe European Group Headquarters 210 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | ||
Former [2007/44] | Shaya, Darrin Maurice Black & Decker, Patent Department, 210 Bath Road Slough SL1 3YD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06720848.8 | 16.02.2006 | [2007/44] | WO2006US05643 | Priority number, date | US20060355244 | 15.02.2006 Original published format: US 355244 | US20050654854P | 18.02.2005 Original published format: US 654854 P | [2007/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006089117 | Date: | 24.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1848559 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1848559 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.10.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B23B31/02 | [2007/44] | CPC: |
B23B31/1238 (EP,US);
B23B31/1207 (EP,US);
B23B31/1253 (EP,US);
B23B2228/16 (EP,US);
B23B2270/12 (EP,US);
Y10T279/17615 (EP,US);
Y10T279/26 (EP,US);
Y10T279/29 (EP,US);
Y10T279/3487 (EP,US);
Y10T408/953 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/44] |
Former [2007/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SELBSTZENTRIERENDES BOHRFUTTER | [2007/44] | English: | SELF-CENTERING DRILL BIT CHUCK | [2007/44] | French: | MANDRIN PORTE-MECHE A AUTO-CENTRAGE | [2007/44] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2007 | Search fee paid | 10.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/44] | 23.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/41] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 07.11.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 07.11.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.11.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 23.02.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 23.02.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.03.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.02.2006 | AT | 31.10.2018 | CY | 31.10.2018 | CZ | 31.10.2018 | DK | 31.10.2018 | EE | 31.10.2018 | ES | 31.10.2018 | FI | 31.10.2018 | IT | 31.10.2018 | LT | 31.10.2018 | LV | 31.10.2018 | MC | 31.10.2018 | NL | 31.10.2018 | PL | 31.10.2018 | RO | 31.10.2018 | SE | 31.10.2018 | SI | 31.10.2018 | SK | 31.10.2018 | TR | 31.10.2018 | BG | 31.01.2019 | GR | 01.02.2019 | IE | 16.02.2019 | LU | 16.02.2019 | BE | 28.02.2019 | CH | 28.02.2019 | FR | 28.02.2019 | IS | 28.02.2019 | LI | 28.02.2019 | PT | 01.03.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
CY | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
TR | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IE | 16.02.2019 | ||
LU | 16.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
TR | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IE | 16.02.2019 | ||
LU | 16.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IE | 16.02.2019 | ||
LU | 16.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IE | 16.02.2019 | ||
LU | 16.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
LU | 16.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
LU | 16.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
LU | 16.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 31.10.2018 | |
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 31.10.2018 | |
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 31.10.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2317829 (SCHAMMBERGER DIETER) [A] 1* figure 2 *; | [A]GB2189723 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [X]US6540237 (TEMPLE-WILSON RICHARD E [GB]) [X] 1-17 * column 3, line 5 - line 13; figures 1,2 * * column 3, line 17 - line 20 * | International search | [A]US5299814 (SALPAKA GLENN L [US]); | [A]US5409243 (SHADECK LOUIS M [US], et al); | [A]US6196554 (GADDIS BENJAMIN A [US], et al); | [A]US6354605 (AULTMAN WILLIAM H [US]); | [A]US6520508 (JORDAN PAUL T [US]); | [X]US6540237 (TEMPLE-WILSON RICHARD E [GB]) | Examination | US5215317 | US2006175768 | by applicant | US6540237 |