EP1871960 - Method for coating a cover profile and at least one compensation profile used for floor covering [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/01] | METHOD FOR COATING A COVER PROFILE AND AT LEAST ONE COMPENSATION PROFILE OF A COVER PROFILE, WHICH CAN BE CONNECTED TO A COVER FLANGE OF A COVER PROFILE AND IS USED FOR FLOOR COVERING HAVING A COVER LAYER | ||
[2009/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.2010 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neuhofer, Martin Haslau 56 4893 Zell am Moos / AT | [2008/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/01] | Representative(s) | Hübscher, Helmut, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Hübscher Postfach 411 4010 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/01] | Hübscher, Helmut, et al Spittelwiese 7 4020 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 06721215.9 | 20.04.2006 | [2008/01] | WO2006AT00157 | Priority number, date | AT20050000659 | 20.04.2005 Original published format: AT 6592005 | [2008/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006110934 | Date: | 26.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1871960 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1871960 | Date: | 28.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | E04F19/06 | [2008/01] | CPC: |
E04F19/065 (EP,US);
E04F19/062 (EP,US);
E04F19/02 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1026 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1028 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1062 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Beschichten eines Abdeckprofils und wenigstens eines Ausgleichsprofils für Fussbodenbeläge | [2009/24] | English: | Method for coating a cover profile and at least one compensation profile used for floor covering | [2009/24] | French: | Procédé d'application d'un revêtement sur un profile de recouvrement et sur au moins un profile d'égalisation pour revêtements de sols | [2009/24] |
Former [2008/01] | VERFAHREN ZUM BESCHICHTEN EINES ABDECKPROFILS UND WENIGSTENS EINES AN EINEN ABDECKFLANSCH DES ABDECKPROFILS ANSCHLIESSBAREN AUSGLEICHPROFILS EINER ABDECKVORRICHTUNG FÜR FUSSBODENBELÄGE MIT EINER DECKSCHICHT | ||
Former [2008/01] | METHOD FOR COATING A COVER PROFILE AND AT LEAST ONE COMPENSATION PROFILE OF A COVER PROFILE, WHICH CAN BE CONNECTED TO A COVER FLANGE OF A COVER PROFILE AND IS USED FOR FLOOR COVERING HAVING A COVER LAYER | ||
Former [2008/01] | PROCEDE D'APPLICATION D'UN REVETEMENT SUR UN PROFILE DE RECOUVREMENT ET SUR AU MOINS UN PROFILE D'EGALISATION, POUVANT ETRE RACCORDE A UNE BRIDE DE RECOUVREMENT DU PROFILE DE RECOUVREMENT, D'UN DISPOSITIF DE RECOUVREMENT POUR REVETEMENTS DE SOLS POURVU D'UNE COUCHE DE SURFACE | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 04.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.10.2009 | CZ | 28.10.2009 | DK | 28.10.2009 | EE | 28.10.2009 | FI | 28.10.2009 | IE | 28.10.2009 | LT | 28.10.2009 | LV | 28.10.2009 | NL | 28.10.2009 | PL | 28.10.2009 | RO | 28.10.2009 | SE | 28.10.2009 | SI | 28.10.2009 | SK | 28.10.2009 | TR | 28.10.2009 | BG | 28.01.2010 | GR | 29.01.2010 | ES | 08.02.2010 | IS | 28.02.2010 | PT | 01.03.2010 | LU | 20.04.2010 | HU | 29.04.2010 | CH | 30.04.2010 | LI | 30.04.2010 | MC | 30.04.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | CY | 28.10.2009 | |
CZ | 28.10.2009 | ||
DK | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
FI | 28.10.2009 | ||
IE | 28.10.2009 | ||
LT | 28.10.2009 | ||
LV | 28.10.2009 | ||
NL | 28.10.2009 | ||
PL | 28.10.2009 | ||
RO | 28.10.2009 | ||
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
SK | 28.10.2009 | ||
BG | 28.01.2010 | ||
GR | 29.01.2010 | ||
ES | 08.02.2010 | ||
IS | 28.02.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
LU | 20.04.2010 | ||
HU | 29.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/43] | CY | 28.10.2009 | |
CZ | 28.10.2009 | ||
DK | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
FI | 28.10.2009 | ||
IE | 28.10.2009 | ||
LT | 28.10.2009 | ||
LV | 28.10.2009 | ||
PL | 28.10.2009 | ||
RO | 28.10.2009 | ||
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
SK | 28.10.2009 | ||
BG | 28.01.2010 | ||
GR | 29.01.2010 | ||
ES | 08.02.2010 | ||
IS | 28.02.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
LU | 20.04.2010 | ||
HU | 29.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 28.10.2009 | |
CZ | 28.10.2009 | ||
DK | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
FI | 28.10.2009 | ||
IE | 28.10.2009 | ||
LT | 28.10.2009 | ||
LV | 28.10.2009 | ||
PL | 28.10.2009 | ||
RO | 28.10.2009 | ||
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
SK | 28.10.2009 | ||
BG | 28.01.2010 | ||
GR | 29.01.2010 | ||
ES | 08.02.2010 | ||
IS | 28.02.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
HU | 29.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | CY | 28.10.2009 | |
CZ | 28.10.2009 | ||
DK | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
FI | 28.10.2009 | ||
IE | 28.10.2009 | ||
LT | 28.10.2009 | ||
LV | 28.10.2009 | ||
PL | 28.10.2009 | ||
RO | 28.10.2009 | ||
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
SK | 28.10.2009 | ||
BG | 28.01.2010 | ||
GR | 29.01.2010 | ||
ES | 08.02.2010 | ||
IS | 28.02.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | CY | 28.10.2009 | |
CZ | 28.10.2009 | ||
DK | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
FI | 28.10.2009 | ||
IE | 28.10.2009 | ||
LT | 28.10.2009 | ||
LV | 28.10.2009 | ||
PL | 28.10.2009 | ||
RO | 28.10.2009 | ||
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
SK | 28.10.2009 | ||
BG | 28.01.2010 | ||
GR | 29.01.2010 | ||
ES | 08.02.2010 | ||
IS | 28.02.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/41] | CY | 28.10.2009 | |
CZ | 28.10.2009 | ||
DK | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
FI | 28.10.2009 | ||
IE | 28.10.2009 | ||
LT | 28.10.2009 | ||
LV | 28.10.2009 | ||
PL | 28.10.2009 | ||
RO | 28.10.2009 | ||
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
SK | 28.10.2009 | ||
BG | 28.01.2010 | ||
ES | 08.02.2010 | ||
IS | 28.02.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/26] | CY | 28.10.2009 | |
FI | 28.10.2009 | ||
LT | 28.10.2009 | ||
LV | 28.10.2009 | ||
PL | 28.10.2009 | ||
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
ES | 08.02.2010 | ||
IS | 28.02.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 08.02.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0862976 (NEUHOFER FRANZ JUN [AT]) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 32 - column 3, line 3; figures 2-4; claim 1 *; | [DA]DE69518852T (PERSTORP FLOORING AB TRELLEBOR [SE]) [DA] 1-3 * abstract *; | [XA]US2003154678 (STANCHFIELD OLIVER [US]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0034] , [0035] , [0059] , [0060]; figures 6,19 * [A] 2,3; | [PXA]AT500734 (NEUHOFER FRANZ JUN [AT]) [PX] 1 * the whole document * [PA] 2,3; | [E]FR2881157 (DEPRO FRANCE SARL [FR]) [E] 1-3* the whole document * |