EP1872090 - MEASUREMENT SYSTEM FOR MEASURING CYLINDER PRESSURE IN AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.02.2012 [2012/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AVL List GmbH Hans-List-Platz 1 8020 Graz / AT | [2008/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STELZER, Andreas Donauerweg 7 A-4040 Linz / AT | 02 /
HAUSER, Robert Klebensteinweg 14 A-9551 Bodensdorf / AT | 03 /
SCHUSTER, Stefan Betlehemstrasse 1d/3/8 A-4020 Linz / DE | 04 /
SCHEIBLHOFER, Stefan Heliosallee 100/10 A-4030 Linz / AT | 05 /
LEITMEIER, Klaus Bürgergasse 13 A-8010 Graz / AT | [2008/01] | Representative(s) | Pinter, Rudolf Pinter & Weiss OG Patentanwälte Prinz-Eugen-Strasse 70 1040 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/01] | Pinter, Rudolf Pinter, Laminger & Weiss OG Patentanwälte Prinz-Eugen-Strasse 70 1040 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 06721218.3 | 20.04.2006 | [2008/01] | WO2006AT00160 | Priority number, date | AT20050000249 | 21.04.2005 Original published format: AT 2492005 | [2008/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006110935 | Date: | 26.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1872090 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1872090 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01D3/02, G01L9/08 | [2008/01] | CPC: |
G01L23/10 (EP,US);
G01D3/022 (EP,US);
G01L9/0025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2008/31] |
Former [2008/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MESSSYSTEM ZUR ZYLINDERDRUCKMESSUNG AN BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE | [2008/01] | English: | MEASUREMENT SYSTEM FOR MEASURING CYLINDER PRESSURE IN AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2008/01] | French: | SYSTEME DE MESURE DESTINE A LA MESURE DE LA PRESSION DANS LES CYLINDRES D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2008/01] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 13.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5220836 (HARMS KLAUS-CHRISTOPH [AT], et al); | [DA]AT5042U (AVL LIST GMBH [AT]); | [PA]WO2005095895 (KISTLER HOLDING AG [CH], et al) |