EP1871956 - MASONRY BLOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.03.2013 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.05.2013 [2013/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henderson, Rodney 97 Abernethy Road Belmont, Western Australia 6104 / AU | [2008/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/01] | Representative(s) | Tomkinson, Alexandra Bailey Walsh & Co LLP 1 York Place Leeds, LS1 2DR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/01] | Tomkinson, Alexandra Bailey Walsh & Co 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06721383.5 | 13.04.2006 | [2008/01] | WO2006AU00501 | Priority number, date | AU20050901902 | 18.04.2005 Original published format: AU 2005901902 | AU20050903270 | 22.06.2005 Original published format: AU 2005903270 | [2008/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006110943 | Date: | 26.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1871956 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 26.10.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | E02D29/02, E02D17/20 | [2008/01] | CPC: |
E02D29/0225 (EP,US);
E02D17/205 (GB);
E02D29/025 (EP,GB,US);
E04B2/14 (GB);
E04B2/22 (GB);
E04C1/39 (GB)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MAUERBLOCK | [2008/01] | English: | MASONRY BLOCK | [2008/01] | French: | BLOC DE MAÇONNERIE | [2008/01] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 09.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 09.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 18.02.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 20.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/18] | 10.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.11.2008 | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 31.03.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 31.03.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8802050 (FORSBERG PAUL J [US]); | [X]WO02097199 (DAE SUNG WALL STONE CO LTD [KR], et al); | [X]US2002187010 (MACDONALD ROBERT A [US], et al) | International search | [X]JP2003321839 ; | [X]JP2003166244 ; | [X]JP2003003474 ; | [X]JP2004060220 ; | [X]US4884921 (SMITH PETER J [US]); | [X]US5066169 (GAVIN NORMAN W [US], et al); | by applicant | WO02097199 | US2002187010 |