EP1877105 - A METHOD OF FORMING AN INJECTABLE RADIOACTIVE COMPOSITION OF A CARBON ENCAPSULATED RADIOACTIVE PARTICULATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2014 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.07.2014 [2014/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE AUSTRALIAN NATIONAL UNIVERSITY Acton, ACT 0200 / AU | [2008/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWITT, Rodney, James DECEASED . / AU | 02 /
BURCH, William, Martin 39 Coopernook Avenue Gymea Bay, NSW 2227 / AU | 03 /
SENDEN, Timothy, John 27 Bandjalong Cresent Aranda, NSW 2614 / AU | 04 /
STEPHENS, Ross, Wentworth 18 McKaill Crescent Stirling, ACT 2611 / AU | [2011/01] |
Former [2008/03] | 01 /
BROWITT, Rodney, James 59 Ashburton Circuit Kaleen, ACT 2617 / AU | ||
02 /
BURCH, William, Martin 39 Coopernook Avenue Gymea Bay, NSW 2227 / AU | |||
03 /
SENDEN, Timothy, John 27 Bandjalong Cresent Aranda, NSW 2614 / AU | |||
04 /
STEPHENS, Ross, Wentworth 18 McKaill Crescent Stirling, ACT 2611 / AU | Representative(s) | Goodfellow, Hugh Robin, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2013/33] |
Former [2008/03] | Goodfellow, Hugh Robin, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06721434.6 | 28.04.2006 | [2008/03] | WO2006AU00554 | Priority number, date | AU20050902180 | 29.04.2005 Original published format: AU 2005902180 | [2008/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006116798 | Date: | 09.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1877105 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1877105 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 09.11.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K51/12, A61K51/02, A61K103/10 | [2008/03] | CPC: |
A61K51/1244 (EP,US);
A61K51/12 (KR);
A61K51/00 (KR);
A61K51/02 (KR);
B82Y40/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BILDUNG EINER INJIZIERBAREN RADIOAKTIVEN ZUSAMMENSETZUNG AUS EINER IN KOHLENSTOFF EINGESCHLOSSENEN RADIOAKTIVEN PARTIKULÄREN SUBSTANZ | [2008/03] | English: | A METHOD OF FORMING AN INJECTABLE RADIOACTIVE COMPOSITION OF A CARBON ENCAPSULATED RADIOACTIVE PARTICULATE | [2008/03] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE FORMER UNE COMPOSITION RADIOACTIVE INJECTABLE DE PARTICULES RADIOACTIVES ENCAPSULEES DANS DU CARBONE | [2008/03] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2007 | Search fee paid | 26.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 26.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/03] | 24.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.12.2012 | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5064634 (BURCH WILLIAM M [AU]) [A] 1-21 * column 2, lines 1-38 ** column 4, lines 1-20 *; | [E]EP1745803 (VITA MEDICAL AUSTRALIA PTY LTD [AU]) [E] 1-21 * page 4, line 26 - page 6, line 19 * * page 11, line 15 - page 12, line 17 * | International search | [A]WO9315768 (NYCOMED SALUTAR INC [US]); | [X]US5792241 (BROWITT RODNEY [AU]); | [X]WO9904827 (UNIV AUSTRALIAN [AU], et al) |