EP1905225 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TRANSMITTING VIDEO TO A MOBILE TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2011 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2011 [2011/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Capture-Cam IP Pty Ltd 533 Little Lonsdale Street, Level 11 Melbourne VIC 3000 / AU | [2008/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOSNIK, Dmitri c/o Level 11 533 Little Lonsdale Street Melbourne Victoria 3000 / AU | [2008/14] | Representative(s) | Mertens, Hans Victor Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) J.J. Viottastraat 31 1071 JP Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/14] | Mertens, Hans Victor Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 06721500.4 | 12.05.2006 | [2008/14] | WO2006AU00625 | Priority number, date | AU20050902459 | 13.05.2005 Original published format: AU 2005902459 | [2008/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006119576 | Date: | 16.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1905225 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 16.11.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04M11/00, G08B25/00, H04N7/18 | [2008/14] | CPC: |
H04N7/17336 (EP);
H04N21/41407 (EP);
H04N21/6437 (EP);
H04N21/6581 (EP);
H04N21/6587 (EP);
H04N7/181 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM SENDEN VON VIDEO ZU EINEM MOBILEN ENDGERÄT | [2008/14] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TRANSMITTING VIDEO TO A MOBILE TERMINAL | [2008/14] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE TRANSMISSION D'UNE VIDEO A UN TERMINAL MOBILE | [2008/14] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 13.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/14] | 28.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/30] | 11.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US2003018975 ; | [X]US6559769 ; | [X]US6744865 ; | [X]US6778084 ; | [X]US6798344 ; | [XP]GB2416897 |